EP1839863 - Ink control apparatus, printer, and printing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries Printing & Packaging Machinery, Ltd. 1-1, Itosaki Minami 1-chome Mihara Hiroshima 729-0393 / JP | [2010/43] |
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 16-5, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku 108-8215 Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagai, Hideaki 6-22 Kan-on-shin-machi, 4-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima-ken 733-8553 / JP | 02 /
Kaneko, Masahito 6-22 Kan-on-shin-machi 4-chome, Nishi-ku Hiroshima, Hiroshima-ken 33-8553 / JP | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/40] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07002083.9 | 31.01.2007 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | JP20060089302 | 28.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006089302 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1839863 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1839863 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41F31/04, B41F33/00 | [2011/31] | CPC: |
B41F31/045 (EP,US);
B41F33/0009 (EP,US);
B41F33/0027 (EP,US);
B41F33/0045 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/40] | B41F31/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/40] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Farbsteuerung, Drucker und Druckverfahren | [2007/40] | English: | Ink control apparatus, printer, and printing method | [2007/40] | French: | Dispositif de réglage de l'encre, imprimante et procédé d'impression | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 13.09.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS58166056 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD, et al) [X] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [X]GB2140353 (DAINIPPON SCREEN MFG) [X] 1-24* the whole document *; | [X]JPS61120751 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [X] 1-24 * the whole document * |