EP1816805 - Ad-hoc network and method employing globally optimized routes for packets [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eaton Corporation Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland, Ohio 44114-2584 / US | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Das, Sujit Ranjan 13310 Crestwood Court New Berlin WI 53151 Waukesha / US | 02 /
Pereira, Luis Rafael 5016 N. 83rd Street Milwaukee WI 53218 Milwaukee / US | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Geyer, Ulrich F. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | Geyer, Ulrich F. WAGNER & GEYER, Patentanwälte, Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07002140.7 | 31.01.2007 | [2007/32] | Priority number, date | US20060347077 | 02.02.2006 Original published format: US 347077 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1816805 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
H04W40/30 (EP,US);
H04L45/42 (EP,US);
H04W40/248 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DK, GB, LU, NL [2008/16] |
Former [2007/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ad-hoc-Netzwerk und Verfahren unter Anwendung global optimierter Routen für Pakete | [2007/32] | English: | Ad-hoc network and method employing globally optimized routes for packets | [2007/32] | French: | Réseau ad hoc et procédé utilisant des voies globalement optimisées pour les paquets | [2007/32] | Examination procedure | 23.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 06.09.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/03] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.09.2007 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.08.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2009 | 31.01.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.07.2010 | 31.01.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   29.07.2011 | 31.01.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   31.07.2012 | 31.01.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004008663 (SRIKRISHNA DEVABHAKTUNI [US], et al) [A] 22-26 * column 7, line 5 - column 8, line 12 *; | [A]EP1453245 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-26* paragraphs [0025] , [0037] *; | [DA]EP1480387 (EATON CORP [US]) [DA] * the whole document *; | [X]US2005157661 (CHO KI-HYOUNG [KR]) [X] 1-26 * paragraphs [0070] , [0076] , [0077]; figure 4 * |