EP1903653 - Over-voltage protection for power and data applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, FR, GB | published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | [2018/52] |
Former [2017/28] | For all designated states Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | ||
Former [2010/20] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | ||
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states Semiconductor Components Industries, LLC 5005 East McDowell Road Phoenix Arizona 85008 / US | ||
Former [2008/13] | For all designated states AMI Semiconductor Belgium BVBA Westerring 15 9700 Oudenaarde / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bertin, Jacques 375 Vista Drive Pocatello, Idaho 83201 / US | 02 /
D'Haeze, Luc Rue de l'Alouetee 37 7750 Orroir (Mont de l'enclus) / BE | [2008/13] | Representative(s) | Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/39] | Bosch, Matthias Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2010/03] | Bosch, Matthias Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/13] | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goën & Co. Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 07002151.4 | 01.02.2007 | [2008/13] | Priority number, date | EP20060447101 | 31.08.2006 Original published format: EP 06447101 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1903653 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1903653 | Date: | 01.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1903653 | Date: | 26.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2015 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/04, G06F1/26 | [2015/14] | CPC: |
G06F1/305 (EP,US);
G06F1/26 (EP,US);
H02H9/04 (EP,US);
H02H9/046 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48137 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US);
H01L2924/1305, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/13091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/13] | H02H9/04 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2015/46] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 01.10.2015 | BA | 01.10.2015 | HR | 01.10.2015 | MK | 01.10.2015 | RS | 01.10.2015 | Title | German: | Überspannungsschutz für Strom- und Datenanwendungen | [2008/13] | English: | Over-voltage protection for power and data applications | [2008/13] | French: | Protection contre les surtensions pour des applications électriques et de données | [2008/13] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2015 | Examination requested [2015/46] | 02.10.2015 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 09.11.2015 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2018 | Opposition(s) | 27.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.09.2018 | NL | 26.09.2018 | GB | 01.02.2019 | BE | 28.02.2019 | FR | 28.02.2019 | [2020/11] |
Former [2019/21] | IT | 26.09.2018 | |
NL | 26.09.2018 | ||
Former [2019/20] | NL | 26.09.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US6936994 (GIMLAN GIDEON [US]) [X] 1-5 * abstract * * figure 1a * * column 9, line 40 - line 64 * [A] 6-17; | [A]US2006173581 (ELKAYAM SHIMON [IL], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract * * figure 2a ** paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0041] * |