EP1777751 - Multi-state non-volatile integrated circuit memory systems that employ dielectric storage elements [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.07.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SanDisk Corporation 601 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2009/23] |
Former [2007/17] | For all designated states SanDisk Corporation 140 Caspian Court Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Harari, Eliyahou 20238 Hill Avenue Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 02 /
Samachisa, George 6858 Castlerock Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | 03 /
Yuan, Jack H. 10339 Tula Lane Cupertino, CA 94014 / US | 04 /
Guterman, Daniel C. 305 Jacaranda Drive Fremont, CA 94539 / US | [2009/35] |
Former [2007/17] | 01 /
Harari, Eliyahou 20238 Hill Avenue Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | ||
02 /
Samachisa, George 6858 Castlerock Drive San Jose, CA 95120 / US | |||
03 /
Yuan, Jack H. 10339 Tula Lane Cupertino, CA 94014 / US | |||
04 /
Gutermann, Daniel C. 305 Jacaranda Drive Fremont, CA 94539 / US | Representative(s) | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/17] | Hitchcock, Esmond Antony Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07002288.4 | 31.10.2002 | [2007/17] | Priority number, date | US20010002696 | 31.10.2001 Original published format: US 2696 | US20020161235 | 31.05.2002 Original published format: US 161235 | US20020280352 | 25.10.2002 Original published format: US 280352 | [2007/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1777751 | Date: | 25.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1777751 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | [2007/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1777751 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/792 | [2007/17] | CPC: |
B82Y10/00 (EP,US);
H10B43/30 (EP,US);
G11C11/5671 (EP,US);
G11C16/0466 (EP,US);
G11C16/0483 (EP,US);
H01L29/4234 (EP,US);
H01L29/7923 (EP,US);
H10B41/30 (EP,US);
H10B41/35 (EP,US);
H10B69/00 (EP,US);
G11C16/0475 (EP,US);
G11C16/0491 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2007/17] | Title | German: | Nichtflüchtige integrierte Mehrzustands-Speichersysteme, die dielektrische Speicherelemente verwenden | [2007/17] | English: | Multi-state non-volatile integrated circuit memory systems that employ dielectric storage elements | [2007/17] | French: | Systèmes de mémoire à circuit intégré non-volatile et à multiples états qui utilisent des éléments de mémorisation diélectrique | [2007/17] | Examination procedure | 02.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/17] | 13.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02784379.6 / EP1446840 | Opposition(s) | 27.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/31] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.09.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 30.09.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.08.2009 | BE | 26.08.2009 | CY | 26.08.2009 | CZ | 26.08.2009 | DK | 26.08.2009 | EE | 26.08.2009 | FI | 26.08.2009 | IT | 26.08.2009 | SE | 26.08.2009 | SK | 26.08.2009 | TR | 26.08.2009 | CH | 31.10.2009 | IE | 31.10.2009 | LI | 31.10.2009 | LU | 31.10.2009 | MC | 31.10.2009 | BG | 26.11.2009 | GR | 27.11.2009 | ES | 07.12.2009 | PT | 28.12.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/22] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
IE | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
LU | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
IT | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
IE | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
CH | 31.10.2009 | ||
IE | 31.10.2009 | ||
LI | 31.10.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
GR | 27.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
BE | 26.08.2009 | ||
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/27] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
CZ | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
SK | 26.08.2009 | ||
MC | 31.10.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
DK | 26.08.2009 | ||
EE | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/19] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
ES | 07.12.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | ||
BG | 26.11.2009 | ||
PT | 28.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | AT | 26.08.2009 | |
CY | 26.08.2009 | ||
FI | 26.08.2009 | ||
SE | 26.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JP2001148434 ; | [A]US5705415 (ORLOWSKI MARIUS K [US], et al) [A] 2-5 * column 1, line 6 - column 1, line 50 *; | [XA]US6011725 (EITAN BOAZ [IL]) [X] 1,6-14 * column 21, line 32 - column 24, line 31 * [A] 2-5; | [XA]WO0165567 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]) [X] 1,6-14 * the whole document * [A] 2-5; | [PX]US2002149060 (OGURA SEIKI O [US], et al) [PX] 1,6-14* page 10, paragraph 156 - page 11, paragraph 171; figures 14-16 * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010309), vol. 2000, no. 22, & JP2001148434 A 20010529 (NEW HEIRO:KK; HALO LSI DESIGN & DEVICE TECHNOL INC) [X] 1,6-14 * abstract * [A] | by applicant | - CHAN ET AL., "A True Single-Transistor Oxide-Nitride-Oxide EEPROM Device", IEEE ELECTRON 0 DEVICE LETTERS, (198703), vol. EDL-8, no. 3, pages 93 - 95 |