EP1816485 - MRI involving motion detection and motion correction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.06.2018 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385, Shimoishigami Otawara-Shi, Tochigi-Ken 324-8550 / JP | [2016/30] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimoisigami Otawara-shi Tochigi-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yui, Masao IPD Toshiba Medical Systems Corp. 1385, Shimoishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi-ken 324-8550 / JP | 02 /
Kassai, Yoshimori IPD Toshiba Medical Systems Corp 1385, Shimoishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi-ken 324-8550 / JP | 03 /
Kuhara, Shigehide IPD Toshiba Medical Systems Corp 1385, Shimoishigami Otawara-shi Tochigi-ken 324-8550 / JP | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/32] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Patenta Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07002298.3 | 02.02.2007 | [2007/32] | Priority number, date | JP20060028286 | 06.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006028286 | JP20060332465 | 08.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006332465 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1816485 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1816485 | Date: | 24.02.2010 | [2010/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.01.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/565, G01R33/567 | [2010/07] | CPC: |
G01R33/56509 (EP,US);
G01R33/5614 (EP,US);
G01R33/5635 (EP,US);
G01R33/5676 (EP,US);
G01R33/546 (EP,US);
G01R33/56518 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/32] | G01R33/565 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [2010/43] |
Former [2007/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MRT mit Bewegungsdetektion und Bewegungskorrektur | [2007/32] | English: | MRI involving motion detection and motion correction | [2007/32] | French: | IRM avec détection du mouvement et correction du mouvement | [2007/32] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/32] | 07.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.09.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 15.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/27] | 27.02.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/27] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2018 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2001043069 (NEHRKE KAY [DE], et al) [I] 1-18 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0039] * * figures 3,4 *; | [I]WO02084318 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [I]WO2004046746 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [I] 1-18 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 20 * * page 6, line 3 - page 7, line 29; figures 2,4 *; | [XP] - YUI M ET AL, "Motion measurement using echoes during SSFP dummy cycles for whole-heart MR coronary artery", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, 14TH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, SEATTLE, WASHINGTON, USA, 6-12 MAY 2006, (20060506), page 2158, XP002562504 [XP] 1-18 * the whole document * | [I] - JUNG BA ET AL, "Navigation of the heart with single-shot images", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, 8TH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, GLASGOW, SCOTLAND, UK, 21-27 APRIL 2001, (20010421), page 753, XP002562505 [I] 1-18 * the whole document * | [I] - KADAH YM ET AL, "Floating navigator echo (FNAV) for in-plane 2D translational motion estimation", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (2004), vol. 51, pages 403 - 407, XP002562506 [I] 1-5,7-18 * Materials and Methods * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/MRM.10704 | [I] - EHMAN RL, FELMLEE JP, "Adaptive technique for high-definition MR imaging of moving structures", RADIOLOGY, (1989), vol. 173, pages 255 - 263, XP002562507 [I] 1-5,7-18 * Methods * * figure 2 * | [A] - MANKE D ET AL, "Novel prospective respiratory motion correction approach for free-breathing coronary MR angiography using a patient-adapted affine motion model", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (20030701), vol. 50, no. 1, ISSN 0740-3194, pages 122 - 131, XP002342540 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.10483 | [A] - NEHRKE K, BÖRNERT, P, "Prospective correction of affine motion for arbitrary MR sequences on clinical scanners", MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ACADEMIC PRESS, DULUTH, MN, US, (2005), vol. 54, pages 1130 - 1138, XP002562508 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/mrm.20686 | [A] - LI JM ET AL, "Respiratory self-navigated SSFP", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, 13TH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, MIAMI BEACH, FLORIDA, USA, 7-13 MAY 2005, (20050507), page 2234, XP002562509 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | [A] - GATEHOUSE PD, FIRMIN DN, "Respiratory navigators in non-stop cine cardiovascular SSFP imaging", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, 12TH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, KYOTO, JAPAN, 15-21 MAY 2004, (20040515), page 1963, XP002562510 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | [A] - SCHAFFER RW ET AL, "Calculating a reference from navigators placed over the heart", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, 10TH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, HONOLULU, HAWAII, USA, 18-24 MAY 2002, (20020518), page 2308, XP002562511 [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2001043069 | WO02084318 | WO2004046746 | - JUNG BA ET AL., "Navigation of the heart with single-shot images", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, 8 TH SCIENTIFIC MEETING AND EXHIBITION, GLASGOW, SCOTLAND, UK, 21-27 APRIL 2001, (20010421), page 753 | - "Floating navigator echo (FNAV) for in-plane 2D translational motion estimation", KADAH YM ET AL., MAGNETIC RESONANCE IN MEDICINE, ACADEMIC PRESS, (2004), vol. 51, pages 403 - 407 | - EHMAN RL; FELMLEE JP, "Adaptive technique for high-definition MR imaging of moving structures", RADIOLOGY, (1989), vol. 173, pages 255 - 263 |