EP1784009 - METHODS AND APPARATUSES PROVIDING SYNCHRONISED ELECTRONIC PROGRAM GUIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/19] | Methods and apparatuses providing synchronised electronic program guide | ||
[2010/42] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.05.2012 [2012/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Indoor Outdoor Entertainment, S.A. C/ Gaspar Fabregas, 81 3rd Floor, Imagina Centro Audiovisual 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat (Barcelona) / ES | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Villar, Enrique Edificio Imagina, c/ Gaspar Fabregas, 81 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | 02 /
Mayor, Eduardo Edificio Imagina, c/ Gaspar Fabregas, 81 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | 03 /
Del Val, David Edificio Imagina, c/ Gaspar Fabregas, 81 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | 04 /
Martin, Gonzalo Edificio Imagina, c/ Gaspar Fabregas, 81 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | 05 /
Zunini, Edgardo Edificio Imagina, c/ Gaspar Fabregas, 81 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | 06 /
Domemech, Eudald Edificio Imagina, c/ Gaspar Fabregas, 81 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | 07 /
Daurell, Albert Edificio Imagina, c/ Gaspar Fabregas, 81 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | 08 /
Coderch, Marcel Edificio Imagina, c/ Gaspar Fabregas, 81 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | 09 /
Fernandez, Jesus Edificio Imagina, c/ Gaspar Fabregas, 81 08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | ZBM Patents - Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Rambla Catalunya, 123 08008 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | ZBM Patents Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Plaza Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2011/28] | Barlocci, Anna ZBM PATENTS Zea, Barlocci & Markvardsen Pl. Catalunya, 1 08002 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2007/19] | Gallego Jiménez, José Fernando BGA - Barroso, Garo & Asociados, Avda. Diagonal 421, 2o 08008 Barcelona / ES | Application number, filing date | 07002512.7 | 10.03.2004 | [2007/19] | Priority number, date | US20030453591P | 10.03.2003 Original published format: US 453591 P | US20030453523P | 10.03.2003 Original published format: US 453523 P | US20030453526P | 10.03.2003 Original published format: US 453526 P | US20030453590P | 10.03.2003 Original published format: US 453590 P | US20030453525P | 10.03.2003 Original published format: US 453525 P | US20030453522P | 10.03.2003 Original published format: US 453522 P | US20030453592P | 10.03.2003 Original published format: US 453592 P | US20030453597P | 10.03.2003 Original published format: US 453597 P | US20030453524P | 10.03.2003 Original published format: US 453524 P | US20030453594P | 10.03.2003 Original published format: US 453594 P | US20030453606P | 10.03.2003 Original published format: US 453606 P | US20030453628P | 10.03.2003 Original published format: US 453628 P | US20030462621P | 14.04.2003 Original published format: US 462621 P | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1784009 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1784009 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | [2010/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/445, H04N7/16 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
H04N7/163 (EP);
H04N21/4334 (EP);
H04N21/442 (EP);
H04N21/4532 (EP);
H04N21/4583 (EP);
H04N21/4622 (EP);
H04N21/47214 (EP);
H04N21/4821 (EP);
H04N21/4828 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2007/19] | H04N5/445 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtungen zur Bereitstellung eines synchronisierten elektronischen Programmführers | [2007/19] | English: | METHODS AND APPARATUSES PROVIDING SYNCHRONISED ELECTRONIC PROGRAM GUIDE | [2010/42] | French: | Procédés et appareil fournissant un guide de programmes électroniques synchronisés | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/19] | Methods and apparatuses providing synchronised electronic program guide | Examination procedure | 02.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/19] | 03.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/22] | 13.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/22] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04718975.8 / EP1622371 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040718975) is 13.07.2006 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0195620 (KIDS CITY CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract *; | [A]US2002054068 (ELLIS MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * figure 14 *; | US2003142958 [ ] (MATSUNAGA TOSHAKI [JP], et al) [ ] * abstract * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0099] ** figure 1 * |