EP1816519 - Novel sulfonium compound, photosensitive composition containing the compound and pattern-forming method using the photosensitive composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawanishi, Yasutomo Fujifilm Corporation 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07002532.5 | 06.02.2007 | [2007/32] | Priority number, date | JP20060029870 | 07.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006029870 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1816519 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1816519 | Date: | 03.11.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/029, C07D333/76 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
C07D333/76 (EP,US);
G03F7/0045 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/038 (KR);
G03F7/0382 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0392 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/0397 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Title | German: | Neue Sulfoniumverbindung, diese enthaltende lichtempfindliche Zusammensetzung und Strukturbildungsverfahren unter Verwendung der lichtempfindlichen Zusammensetzung | [2007/32] | English: | Novel sulfonium compound, photosensitive composition containing the compound and pattern-forming method using the photosensitive composition | [2007/32] | French: | Nouveau composant de sulfonium, composition photosensible comportant le composant et procédé de formation de motif utilisant la composition photosensible | [2007/32] | Examination procedure | 13.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/52] | 13.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.08.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.11.2010 | CY | 03.11.2010 | CZ | 03.11.2010 | DK | 03.11.2010 | EE | 03.11.2010 | FI | 03.11.2010 | HU | 03.11.2010 | IT | 03.11.2010 | LT | 03.11.2010 | LV | 03.11.2010 | NL | 03.11.2010 | PL | 03.11.2010 | RO | 03.11.2010 | SE | 03.11.2010 | SI | 03.11.2010 | SK | 03.11.2010 | TR | 03.11.2010 | BG | 03.02.2011 | GR | 04.02.2011 | GB | 06.02.2011 | IE | 06.02.2011 | LU | 06.02.2011 | ES | 14.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | FR | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | IS | 03.03.2011 | PT | 03.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
TR | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
GB | 06.02.2011 | ||
IE | 06.02.2011 | ||
LU | 06.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CY | 03.11.2010 | ||
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
GB | 06.02.2011 | ||
IE | 06.02.2011 | ||
LU | 06.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
GB | 06.02.2011 | ||
IE | 06.02.2011 | ||
LU | 06.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
GB | 06.02.2011 | ||
IE | 06.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IE | 06.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
IT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
DK | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
PL | 03.11.2010 | ||
RO | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
SK | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
CZ | 03.11.2010 | ||
EE | 03.11.2010 | ||
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
ES | 14.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | AT | 03.11.2010 | |
FI | 03.11.2010 | ||
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
NL | 03.11.2010 | ||
SE | 03.11.2010 | ||
SI | 03.11.2010 | ||
BG | 03.02.2011 | ||
GR | 04.02.2011 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
PT | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 03.11.2010 | |
LT | 03.11.2010 | ||
LV | 03.11.2010 | ||
IS | 03.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 03.11.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03008404 (LAMBERTI SPA [IT], et al) [X] 1,4,6 * page 1, line 4 - line 6; claims 6,7,11,12 ** page 13, line 26 - line 27 *; | [X]US2004265733 (HOULIHAN FRANCIS M [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * paragraphs [0009] , [0010] , [0020] , [0021] , [0025] , [0030] , [0036] , [0042] - [0046]; examples 2,3; claims 1,6 *; | [X]US2005064333 (CRIVELLO JAMES V [US]) [X] 1,4,6 * paragraph [0026]; claim 4 * * see also WO03/098347 *; | [PX]EP1693705 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-6 * paragraph [0012]; compounds A74-A76,A83-A85,A106-A120 * | by applicant | US6680157 | EP1480078 |