EP1820382 - Pneumatic single-grain seeder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2009 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 9-13 49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johannaber, Stefan-Jan Ellerhooksweg 18 49536 Lienen / DE | 02 /
Wiebusch, Thorsten Haslage 1 49205 Hasbergen / DE | 03 /
Götzen, Nils Kurt-Schumacher-Damm 32 49078 Osnabrück / DE | [2007/34] | Application number, filing date | 07002785.9 | 09.02.2007 | [2007/34] | Priority number, date | DE20061007155 | 16.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006007155 | [2007/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1820382 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1820382 | Date: | 07.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A01C7/04 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
A01C7/044 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Title | German: | Pneumatische Einzelkornsämaschine | [2007/34] | English: | Pneumatic single-grain seeder | [2007/34] | French: | Semoir monograine pneumatique | [2007/34] | Examination procedure | 29.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 29.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/51] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 07.01.2009 | CZ | 07.01.2009 | DK | 07.01.2009 | EE | 07.01.2009 | FI | 07.01.2009 | IE | 07.01.2009 | IT | 07.01.2009 | LT | 07.01.2009 | LV | 07.01.2009 | NL | 07.01.2009 | PL | 07.01.2009 | RO | 07.01.2009 | SI | 07.01.2009 | SK | 07.01.2009 | TR | 07.01.2009 | AT | 09.02.2009 | LU | 09.02.2009 | BE | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | BG | 07.04.2009 | SE | 07.04.2009 | GR | 08.04.2009 | ES | 18.04.2009 | IS | 07.05.2009 | PT | 08.06.2009 | HU | 08.07.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
IT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
AT | 09.02.2009 | ||
LU | 09.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
HU | 08.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
IT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
AT | 09.02.2009 | ||
LU | 09.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
IT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
AT | 09.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
AT | 09.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
GR | 08.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
AT | 09.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 07.04.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | CZ | 07.01.2009 | |
DK | 07.01.2009 | ||
EE | 07.01.2009 | ||
FI | 07.01.2009 | ||
IE | 07.01.2009 | ||
LT | 07.01.2009 | ||
LV | 07.01.2009 | ||
NL | 07.01.2009 | ||
PL | 07.01.2009 | ||
RO | 07.01.2009 | ||
SI | 07.01.2009 | ||
SK | 07.01.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
SE | 07.04.2009 | ||
ES | 18.04.2009 | ||
IS | 07.05.2009 | ||
PT | 08.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | NL | 07.01.2009 | |
SI | 07.01.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2291927 (CAMBRIDGE CONSULTANTS [GB]) [Y] 1-3,5,11,15-18 * page 1, line 26 - line 35 * * page 2, line 5 - line 27 * * page 3, line 3 - line 13 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US6142086 (RICHARD LEROY J [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 4, line 45 - line 67 * * column 5, line 1 - line 14 ** figure -; claim - *; | [Y]US6516733 (SAUDER GREGG A [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5,11,15-18 * abstract * * column 6, line 59 - line 67 * * column 7, line 1 - line 8 * * column 7, line 40 - line 62 * * column 8, line 16 - line 53 * * column 9, line 62 - line 67 * * column 10, line 1 - line 37 * * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | FR2291927 | US6516733 | DE102005038155 |