EP1956222 - Method for mounting a preassembled camshaft assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/33] | Camshaft assembly and method for mounting the same | ||
[2009/05] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.04.2010 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Presta TecCenter AG Essanestrasse 10 9492 Eschen / LI | [2008/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schön, Helmut, Dr. Amerdonastrasse 12 6820 Frastanz / AT | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Wegmann, Urs, et al Saschela 3 9479 Oberschan / CH | [2008/33] | Application number, filing date | 07002813.9 | 09.02.2007 | [2008/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1956222 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1956222 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02F7/00, B23P15/00, F01L1/047, B21D53/84 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
F01L1/047 (EP);
F16C35/047 (EP);
F01L2001/0476 (EP);
F01L2303/00 (EP);
F01L2303/01 (EP);
F01L2820/041 (EP);
F16C2360/18 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Montage einer vormontierten Nockenwellenbaugruppe | [2009/05] | English: | Method for mounting a preassembled camshaft assembly | [2009/05] | French: | Procédé de montage d'un bloc d'arbre à cames pré-assemblé | [2009/05] |
Former [2008/33] | Nockenwellenbaugruppe und Verfahren zur Montage einer solchen | ||
Former [2008/33] | Camshaft assembly and method for mounting the same | ||
Former [2008/33] | Bloc d'arbre à cames et son procédé de montage | Examination procedure | 09.02.2007 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 22.11.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.05.2009 | DK | 27.05.2009 | EE | 27.05.2009 | FI | 27.05.2009 | IE | 27.05.2009 | LT | 27.05.2009 | LV | 27.05.2009 | NL | 27.05.2009 | PL | 27.05.2009 | RO | 27.05.2009 | SI | 27.05.2009 | SK | 27.05.2009 | TR | 27.05.2009 | BG | 27.08.2009 | SE | 27.08.2009 | GR | 28.08.2009 | IS | 27.09.2009 | PT | 27.09.2009 | HU | 28.11.2009 | LU | 09.02.2010 | BE | 28.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 27.05.2009 | |
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
HU | 28.11.2009 | ||
LU | 09.02.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 27.05.2009 | |
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
HU | 28.11.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 27.05.2009 | |
DK | 27.05.2009 | ||
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | DK | 27.05.2009 | |
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | DK | 27.05.2009 | |
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
IT | 09.02.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | DK | 27.05.2009 | |
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
GR | 28.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/17] | DK | 27.05.2009 | |
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
BG | 27.08.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | DK | 27.05.2009 | |
EE | 27.05.2009 | ||
FI | 27.05.2009 | ||
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
RO | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SK | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 27.05.2009 | |
IE | 27.05.2009 | ||
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | FI | 27.05.2009 | |
LT | 27.05.2009 | ||
LV | 27.05.2009 | ||
NL | 27.05.2009 | ||
PL | 27.05.2009 | ||
SI | 27.05.2009 | ||
SE | 27.08.2009 | ||
IS | 27.09.2009 | ||
PT | 27.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1223193 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG) [X] 1,4-7,12,14 * the whole document *; | [X]US3563215 (ROSS GRAY E D) [X] 1,4-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US3672338 (YAMANOUCHI YUICHI) [A] 1,8 * figures 1-3 *; | [X]DE3641129 (DAIMLER BENZ AG) [X] 1,2,4-7 * figures 1-3 *; | [A]DE3603938 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1* figures 1,2 *; | [A]GB2205054 (FISCHER AG GEORG) [A] 12,13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19504636 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [X]US5562072 (STOODY JR RICHARD R [US]) [X] 1,4-7,12,14 * the whole document *; | [A]DE10041975 (AVL LIST GMBH [AT]) [A] 1 * figures 1,2 *; | [XY]FR2815092 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 7; | [Y]US2003072508 (ASTNER JOSEF [DE]) [Y] 10,11 * paragraph [0019]; figures 1-3 *; | [XY]DE202006018359U (THYSSENKRUPP PRESTA AG [LI]) [X] 1-6,8,9,12 * paragraphs [0012] , [0022]; figure 1 * [Y] 7,10,11 | by applicant | DE202006018359U |