EP1818177 - Sheet rotary printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.2014 [2014/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koenig & Bauer Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Koenig-Strasse 4 97080 Würzburg / DE | [2007/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jentzsch, Arndt Auerstrasse 208 01640 Coswig / DE | 02 /
Becker, Uwe Kötitzer Strasse 85 01445 Radebeul / DE | 03 /
Nickell, Hartmut Hübschmannstrasse 32 09112 Chemnitz / DE | [2007/33] | Application number, filing date | 07003120.8 | 14.02.2007 | [2007/33] | Priority number, date | DE20061006676 | 14.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006006676 | [2007/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1818177 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1818177 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1818177 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B41F33/00, B41F21/10 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
B41F33/0036 (EP);
B41F21/10 (EP);
B41F21/102 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/33] | B41F33/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2012/36] |
Former [2007/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bogenrotationsdruckmaschine | [2007/33] | English: | Sheet rotary printing press | [2007/33] | French: | Presse rotative d'impression sur feuilles | [2007/33] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/30] | 29.06.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.08.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.03.2013 | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0317665 (KOMORI PRINTING MACH [JP]) [X] 1 * figures 1-2 * * column 1, lines 3-23 * * column 3, lines 41-43 * * column 4, lines 3-16 * * column 4, line 57 - column 5, line 3 * * column 5, lines 16-27 * [I] 2-18; | [XI]EP0737572 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * column 2, lines 16-46 * * column 4, lines 1-15 * * column 4, lines 29-34 * [I] 2-18; | [ID]DE20006513U (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [ID] 1-18 * figures 1-3 ** claims 1-3 *; | [XI]DE102004020252 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [X] 1 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0016] , [0021] * [I] 2-18 | by applicant | EP0317665 | EP0737572 | DE20006513U | DE102004020252 |