EP1821350 - Piezoelectric actuator, drive control method of piezoelectric actuator, and electronic device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2010/48] | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | ||
Former [2007/34] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hashimoto, Yasuharu c/o Seiko Epson Corporation, 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | [2010/30] |
Former [2007/34] | 01 /
Hashimoto, Yasuharu c/o Seiko Epson Corp.,3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano-ken 392-8502 / JP | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/10] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/34] | Hoffmann, Eckart Patentanwalt, Bahnhofstrasse 103 82166 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 07003140.6 | 14.02.2007 | [2007/34] | Priority number, date | JP20060040210 | 17.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006040210 | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1821350 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1821350 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | [2008/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1821350 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/04, H01L41/09 | [2010/28] | CPC: |
H02N2/142 (EP,US);
G04C17/0058 (EP,US);
G04C3/12 (EP,US);
H02N2/002 (US);
H02N2/0035 (EP);
H02N2/103 (EP,US);
H02N2/123 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/34] | H01L41/09 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2008/48] |
Former [2007/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Piezoelektrischer Stellantrieb, Verfahren zur Antriebssteuerung des piezoelektrischen Stellantriebs und elektronische Vorrichtung | [2007/34] | English: | Piezoelectric actuator, drive control method of piezoelectric actuator, and electronic device | [2007/34] | French: | Actionneur piézoélectrique, procédé de commande d'entraînement d'un actionneur piézoélectrique, et dispositif électronique | [2010/30] |
Former [2007/34] | Actionneur piézoélectrique, procédé de commande de lecteur d'un actionneur piézoélectrique, et dispositif électronique | Examination procedure | 05.08.2008 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 10.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000004590 (SEIKO INSTR INC); | [DA]JP2005086884 (IAI KK, et al); | [AP]US7005776 (IINO AKIHIRO [JP], et al) | by applicant | US5406160 |