EP1959378 - Collaboration application and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Software AG Uhlandstrasse 12 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2014/35] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states SOFTWARE AG Uhlandstrasse 12 64297 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kürpick, Dr. Peter Elfengrund 70 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 02 /
Laures, Guido Römerstrasse 53 69115 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Stoesser, Thomas Heinrich-Delp-Str. 170 64297 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
Henniger, Jens Liebfrauenstr. 35 64289 Darmstadt / DE | 05 /
Hirth, Daniel Rosbaumweg 17 79110 Freiburg / DE | 06 /
Müller, Björn Hindemithweg 13 69245 Bammental / DE | [2014/33] |
Former [2013/18] | 01 /
Kürpick, Dr. Peter Elfengrund 70 64297 Darmstadt / DE | ||
02 /
Laures, Guido Römerstrasse 53 69115 Heildelberg / DE | |||
03 /
Stoesser, Thomas Heinrich-Delp-Str. 170 64297 Darmstadt / DE | |||
04 /
Henniger, Jens Liebfrauenstr. 35 64289 Darmstadt / DE | |||
05 /
Hirth, Daniel Rosbaumweg 17 79110 Freiburg / DE | |||
06 /
Müller, Björn Hindemithweg 13 69245 Bammental / DE | |||
Former [2008/34] | 01 /
Kürpick, Dr. Peter Souchaystr.5 60594 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
02 /
Laures, Guido Römerstrasse 53 69115 Heildelberg / DE | |||
03 /
Stoesser, Thomas Heinrich-Delp-Str. 170 64297 Darmstadt / DE | |||
04 /
Henniger, Jens Liebfrauenstr. 35 64289 Darmstadt / DE | |||
05 /
Hirth, Daniel Rosbaumweg 17 79110 Freiburg / DE | |||
06 /
Müller, Björn Hindemithweg 13 69245 Bammental / DE | Representative(s) | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2014/35] |
Former [2008/34] | Heselberger, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle . Pagenberg . Dost . Altenburg . Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07003156.2 | 14.02.2007 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1959378 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1959378 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/10, G06Q10/00 | [2012/46] | CPC: |
G06Q10/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/34] | G06Q10/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Title | German: | Kollaborationsanwendung und Verfahren | [2008/34] | English: | Collaboration application and method | [2008/34] | French: | Application et procédé de collaboration | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2007 | Examination requested [2008/34] | 15.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 31.10.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.07.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2008 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.02.2007 | AT | 27.08.2014 | BE | 27.08.2014 | CY | 27.08.2014 | CZ | 27.08.2014 | DK | 27.08.2014 | EE | 27.08.2014 | ES | 27.08.2014 | FI | 27.08.2014 | IT | 27.08.2014 | LT | 27.08.2014 | LV | 27.08.2014 | MC | 27.08.2014 | NL | 27.08.2014 | PL | 27.08.2014 | RO | 27.08.2014 | SE | 27.08.2014 | SI | 27.08.2014 | SK | 27.08.2014 | TR | 27.08.2014 | BG | 27.11.2014 | GR | 28.11.2014 | IS | 27.12.2014 | PT | 29.12.2014 | IE | 14.02.2015 | LU | 14.02.2015 | CH | 28.02.2015 | LI | 28.02.2015 | FR | 02.03.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/32] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
BE | 27.08.2014 | ||
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.02.2015 | ||
LU | 14.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.02.2015 | ||
LU | 14.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
FR | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
IE | 14.02.2015 | ||
LU | 14.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SI | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
CH | 28.02.2015 | ||
LI | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
MC | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/44] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.02.2015 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
BE | 28.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
PL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
CZ | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
EE | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
SK | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
DK | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
IT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
RO | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
NL | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 27.08.2014 | |
CY | 27.08.2014 | ||
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
LV | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
IS | 27.12.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 27.08.2014 | |
ES | 27.08.2014 | ||
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
GR | 28.11.2014 | ||
PT | 29.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 27.08.2014 | |
FI | 27.08.2014 | ||
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
BG | 27.11.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 27.08.2014 | |
LT | 27.08.2014 | ||
SE | 27.08.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 27.08.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004158495 (GENNARO NORMAN [US], et al) [X] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [X]US2006010197 (OVENDEN FRANCIS [US]) [X] 1-24* the whole document *; | [X]EP1705913 (COLLABORATION PROPERTIES INC [US]) [X] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraphs [0010] - [0014] - [0022] , [0023] , [0035] , [3672] , [0073]; figures 2a,2b * | by applicant | US2004158495 | US2006010197 | EP1705913 |