EP1830046 - DRIVE UNIT WITH HEAT RECOVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/36] | Drive unit with heat recovery | ||
[2021/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2022 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.12.2020 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/29] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus SE Dachauer Strasse 667 80995 München / DE | ||
Former [2011/10] | For all designated states MAN Truck & Bus AG Dachauer Straße 667 80995 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 80976 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Held, Wolfgang, Dr. Ringstrasse 19 91289 Schnabelwait / DE | 02 /
Raab, Gottfried Schwemmplatzstrasse 29 4320 Perg / AT | [2007/36] | Representative(s) | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Ridlerstraße 57 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/16] | v. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestraße 7 80799 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07003533.2 | 21.02.2007 | [2007/36] | Priority number, date | DE20061010247 | 02.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006010247 | [2007/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1830046 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1830046 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1830046 | Date: | 21.04.2021 | Language: | DE | [2021/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01P7/16, // F01P3/22 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
F01P7/165 (EP,US);
F02B29/0412 (EP,US);
F02B29/0443 (EP,US);
F02M26/08 (EP,US);
F02M26/28 (EP,US);
F01P2050/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2021/16] |
Former [2007/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANTRIEBSEINHEIT MIT WÄRMERÜCKGEWINNUNG | [2021/03] | English: | DRIVE UNIT WITH HEAT RECOVERY | [2021/03] | French: | UNITÉ D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DOTÉE D'UN GAIN DE RETOUR DE CHALEUR | [2021/03] |
Former [2007/36] | Antriebseinheit mit Wärmerückgewinnung | ||
Former [2007/36] | Drive unit with heat recovery | ||
Former [2007/36] | Unité d'entraînement dotée d'un gain de retour de chaleur | Examination procedure | 30.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/02] | 06.06.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.01.2018 | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 25.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2007 | CY | 21.04.2021 | CZ | 21.04.2021 | DK | 21.04.2021 | EE | 21.04.2021 | ES | 21.04.2021 | FI | 21.04.2021 | LT | 21.04.2021 | LV | 21.04.2021 | MC | 21.04.2021 | RO | 21.04.2021 | SI | 21.04.2021 | SK | 21.04.2021 | BG | 21.07.2021 | GR | 22.07.2021 | IS | 21.08.2021 | PT | 23.08.2021 | [2024/20] |
Former [2024/18] | HU | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.04.2021 | ||
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/44] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
MC | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SI | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
EE | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/09] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
RO | 21.04.2021 | ||
SK | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/08] | CZ | 21.04.2021 | |
DK | 21.04.2021 | ||
ES | 21.04.2021 | ||
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | ES | 21.04.2021 | |
FI | 21.04.2021 | ||
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
IS | 21.08.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
PT | 23.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
LV | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
GR | 22.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | ||
BG | 21.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | FI | 21.04.2021 | |
LT | 21.04.2021 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2359974 (DEERE & CO [US]) [Y] 9-12,17-20 * figure - *; | [A]GB2063370 (JOHNSON R H) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]DE3111799 (GRIEPENTROG HARTMUT DR) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]US5408843 (LUKAS HENRY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract * * figure - *; | [A]US2002056444 (CHOU ETSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract ** figure - *; | [Y]EP1243758 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 12,19 * abstract * * figure - *; | [Y]WO03042515 (VALEO THERMIQUE MOTEUR SA [FR], et al) [Y] 1-20 * page 17, paragraph 2 * * page 18, paragraph 3 * * figure - *; | [Y]JP2005330811 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * figure - * | Examination | JPS5696105 | EP0101372 | JP2003232226 | JP2004232492 |