EP1783438 - Water heater [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Occhipinti, Carmelo Via A. Segni, 11 97100 Ragusa / IT | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Celestino, Marco ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi Viale Giovanni Pisano 31 56123 Pisa / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | Celestino, Marco ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi Viale Giovanni Pisano 31 I-56123 Pisa / IT | Application number, filing date | 07003967.2 | 26.09.2003 | [2007/19] | Priority number, date | IT2002PI00053 | 26.09.2002 Original published format: IT PI20020053 | IT2002PI00057 | 18.10.2002 Original published format: IT PI20020057 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1783438 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F24H1/20, F24D17/00, F28D20/00 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
F28D20/0034 (EP);
F24D17/0073 (EP);
F24H1/20 (EP);
F24D3/082 (EP);
F24H1/202 (EP);
F24H1/208 (EP);
F28D2020/0069 (EP);
F28D2020/0078 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Title | German: | Wasserheizer | [2007/19] | English: | Water heater | [2007/19] | French: | Chauffe-eau | [2007/19] | Examination procedure | 09.11.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 17.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 09.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/34] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03021843.2 / EP1403593 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4296799 (STEELE RICHARD S) [X] 1,2,5,6 * figure - *; | [X]EP0173173 (METALLBAU ANSTALT FUER [LI]) [X] 1,3,4 * figure - *; | [A]EP0663569 (BERGMAYR MARTIN MAG ING [AT]) [A] 1-6* abstract * |