EP1782837 - Hapten-carrier conjugates for use in drug-abuse therapy (nicotine) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xenova Research Limited 957 Buckingham Avenue Slough, Berkshire SL1 4NL / GB | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swain, Philip A. 51 Garden Street, No. 1 Boston, MA 02114 / US | 02 /
Schad, Victoria C. 105 Chestnut Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
Greenstein, Julia L. 174 Mount Vernon Street West Newton, MA 02167 / US | 04 /
Exley, Mark A. 201 Reservoir Road Chestnut Hill, MA 02167 / US | 05 /
Fox, Barbara S. 26 Pemberton Road Wayland, MA 01778 / US | 06 /
Powers, Stephen P. 6204 Steams Hill Road Waltham, MA 02451 / US | 07 /
Gefter, Malcom L. 46 Baker Bridge Road Lincoln, MA 01773 / US | 08 /
Briner, Thomas J. 438 Appleton Street Arlington, MA 02174 / US | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/43] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/19] | Jones Day Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 11 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07004080.3 | 27.03.1996 | [2007/19] | Priority number, date | US19950414971 | 31.03.1995 Original published format: US 414971 | US19950563673 | 28.11.1995 Original published format: US 563673 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1782837 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1782837 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, A61K39/385, A61P39/00 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
C07K16/44 (EP,US);
A61K39/0013 (EP,US);
A61K47/646 (EP,US);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/34 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2007/19] | A61K47/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/19] | Title | German: | Hapten-Träger-Konjugate zur Anwendung in der Drogenmissbrauchstherapie (Nikotin) | [2007/19] | English: | Hapten-carrier conjugates for use in drug-abuse therapy (nicotine) | [2007/19] | French: | Conjugués comprenant un haptène et un vecteur utilisés dans la thérapie des abus de drogues (nicotine) | [2007/19] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2009 | Observations by third parties | 02.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/16] | 26.11.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/16] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03008324.0 / EP1329226 | EP96910595.6 / EP0814843 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19960910595) is 06.05.1998 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.06.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 29.06.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.07.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | 17   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO8906974 (PRAXIS BIOLOG INC [US]) [Y] 1-16 * page 15, line 2 - page 16, line 31 *; | [Y]EP0429816 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH]) [Y] 1-16 * page 1, line 1 - line 34 * * page 7, line 30 - line 45; table 1 * * page 15, line 29 - line 36; claims 1-3 *; | [DXY]WO9203163 (CERNY ERICH H [CH]) [DX] 1,2,6-16 * claims 1-10 * * example 1 * * page 4, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 3, paragraph 9 * [Y] 3-5; | [X]WO9323076 (UNIV JOHNS HOPKINS [US]) [X] 1-3,6-16 * page 5, line 30 - line 32 * * page 9, line 32 - page 10, line 4 * * page 15, line 25 - page 16, line 5 * * claims 16-22 *; | [X] - CASTRO ET AL, "Nicotine antibodies: comparison of ligand specificities of antibodies produced against two nicotine conjugates", EUR. J. BIOCHEM., (19800623), vol. 104, pages 331 - 340, XP002457701 [X] 1,2,6-11,14-16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1980.tb04433.x | [X] - CASTRO ET AL, "Characterization of antibodies to nicotine", BIOCHEM. ARCH., (198508), vol. 1, pages 173 - 183, XP000616324 [X] 1,2,6-11,14-16 * abstract * | [Y] - SCHAD V C ET AL, "The potential use of T cell epitopes to alter the immune response", SEMINARS IN IMMUNOLOGY, W.B. SAUNDERS COMPANY, PA, US, (199107), vol. 3, no. 4, ISSN 1044-5323, pages 217 - 224, XP008085501 [Y] 1-16 * abstract * |