EP1965487 - Uninterruptible power supply, connected to a grid [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.01.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gamesa Innovation & Technology, S.L. Avenida Ciudad de la Innovación 9-11 31621 Sarriguren / ES | [2014/28] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states Gamesa Innovation & Technology, S.L. Avenida. Ciudad de la Innovación 9-11 31621 Sarriguren / ES | ||
Former [2009/03] | For all designated states Gamesa Innovation & Technology, S.L. Parque Tecnológico de Bizkaia Edificio 100-1[deg] 48170 Zamudio (Vizcaya) / ES | ||
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states Gamesa Innovation & Technology, S.L. Poligono Industrial Los Agustinos Calle A, s/n 31013 Pamplona, Navarra / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andresen, Björn Vejlsovej, 51 8600 Silkeborg / DK | 02 /
Feddersen, Lorenz FeCon GmbH Eckernförder Landstrasse , 78 24941 Flensburg / DE | [2008/36] | Application number, filing date | 07004118.1 | 28.02.2007 | [2008/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1965487 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H02M5/458, H02J9/06 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
H02J9/062 (EP,US);
H02J3/381 (EP,US);
H02J2300/24 (EP,US);
H02J2300/28 (EP,US);
H02J2300/40 (EP);
Y02B10/70 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/36] | Title | German: | An ein elektrisches Netz angeschlossene unterbrechungsfreie Stromversorgung | [2008/36] | English: | Uninterruptible power supply, connected to a grid | [2008/36] | French: | Alimentation électrique sans coupure raccordée au réseau électrique | [2008/36] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/01] | 29.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/08] | 29.09.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   29.03.2012 | 28.02.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5384792 (HIRACHI KATSUYA [JP]) [X] 1,2,5,12 * column 3 - column 4; figures 1,2 *; | [X]US5612580 (JANONIS VYTAUTAS F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,8-10,12 * abstract * * column 1, line 44 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, line 26 - column 4, line 8; figure 1; claims 1-3,6,10,11 *; | [X]US5771161 (JACKSON KENNETH R [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7 * the whole document *; | [X]US6295215 (FARIA DES [CA], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,9-12 * column 10, line 22 - column 11, line 25; figure 8 *; | [X]JP2004015962 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP, et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,9,12 * abstract *; | [X]US2004085785 (TAIMELA PASI S [US]) [X] 1,2,5,8-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0014] , [0015]; figure 1 *; | [A]US2004145188 (JANSSEN WILHELM [DE], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [X]US2006175904 (POWELL JEFFREY [US]) [X] 1,2,5,6,10-12 * the whole document * |