EP1842824 - Industrial truck with a load carrying device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.11.2010 [2010/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jungheinrich Aktiengesellschaft Am Stadtrand 35 22047 Hamburg / DE | [2009/46] |
Former [2007/41] | For all designated states Jungheinrich Aktiengesellschaft Friedrich-Ebert-Damm 129 22047 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baginski, Ralf, Dipl.-Ing. Rosenthaler Weg 51 21398 Neetze / DE | 02 /
Mänken, Frank, Dr.-Ing Ginsterweg 17 24558 Henstedt-Ulzburg / DE | 03 /
von Werder, Martin, Dipl.-Ing. Braamkampredder 140 22949 Ammersbek / DE | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Schildberg, Peter, et al Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Schildberg, Peter, et al Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Neuer Wall 50 20354 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Schildberg, Peter, et al Neuer Wall 41 20354 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07004312.0 | 02.03.2007 | [2007/41] | Priority number, date | DE20061014447 | 29.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006014447 | [2007/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1842824 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1842824 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1842824 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B66F9/075, H01Q1/22 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
H01Q1/2208 (EP,US);
B66F9/0755 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/27] |
Former [2007/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flurförderzeug mit einem Lasttragmittel | [2007/41] | English: | Industrial truck with a load carrying device | [2007/41] | French: | Chariots de manutention dotés d'un moyen de support de charges | [2007/41] | Examination procedure | 05.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 25.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 02.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03042916 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 4, line 3 - page 15, line 9; figures 2-4,5a,5b,5c,5d,7 *; | [A]US2004102869 (ANDERSEN SCOTT PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0077]; figures 5-10 *; | [A]US2005200457 (BRIDGELALL RAJ [US], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document * |