EP1798223 - Aryl sulfonamides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/25] | Aryl Sulfonamides | ||
[2007/27] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state New state(s): EE, LU, MC, RO, SK | published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ChemoCentryx, Inc. 850 Maude Avenue Mountain View California 94043 / US | [2007/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ungashe, Solomon 36641 Reynols Drive Fremont, California 94536 / US | 02 /
Wei, Zheng 34776 Rumford Terrace Union City, California 94587 / US | 03 /
Wright, J. J. 720, Bair Island Road 107 Redwood City, California 90463 / US | 04 /
Pennell, M. K. Andrew 442 Airlington Street San Francisco, California 94131 / US | [2007/41] |
Former [2007/25] | 01 /
Ungashe, Solomon 36641 Reynols Drive Fremont, California 94536 / US | ||
02 /
Wei, Zheng 72 Duane Street 14 Redwood City, California 94062 / US | |||
03 /
Wright, J. J. 720, Bair Island Road 107 Redwood City, California 90463 / US | |||
04 /
Pennell, M. K. Andrew 442 Airlington Street San Francisco, California 94131 / US | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstraße 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/26] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/20] | Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/25] | Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 07004318.7 | 17.11.2003 | [2007/25] | Priority number, date | US20020427670P | 18.11.2002 Original published format: US 427670 P | [2007/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1798223 | Date: | 20.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1798223 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1798223 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1798223 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C07D413/12, C07D213/50, C07D213/89, C07D213/74, C07D213/70, C07D213/26, C07D241/12, C07D213/84, A61K31/44, A61P29/00 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
C07C311/29 (EP,US);
C07D213/50 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/16 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C311/21 (EP,US);
C07C311/46 (EP,US);
C07C317/14 (EP,US);
C07D213/26 (EP,US);
C07D213/70 (EP,US);
C07D213/74 (EP,US);
C07D213/84 (EP,US);
C07D213/89 (EP,US);
C07D241/12 (EP,US);
C07D413/12 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/25] | C07D213/89 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/25] | Title | German: | Arylsulfonamide | [2007/25] | English: | Aryl sulfonamides | [2007/27] | French: | Arylsulfonamides | [2007/25] |
Former [2007/25] | Aryl Sulfonamides | Examination procedure | 02.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/25] | 15.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03796416.0 / EP1562940 | Divisional application(s) | EP10009944.9 / EP2256116 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030796416) is 14.12.2005 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.04.2012
25.04.2012
ADMISSIBLE Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 40 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US Opponent's representative Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
20.04.2012
25.04.2012
ADMISSIBLE Millennium Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 40 Landsdowne Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US Opponent's representative Harris, Jennifer Lucy, et al, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | 29.05.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.12.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.10.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.12.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 27.01.2014 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.06.2014 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 13.06.2014 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.07.2011 | EE | 20.07.2011 | RO | 20.07.2011 | SI | 20.07.2011 | SK | 20.07.2011 | LU | 17.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2015/22] |
Former [2012/12] | CY | 20.07.2011 | |
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | SI | 20.07.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0230358 (TULARIK INC [US], et al) [A] 1-85 * figures 1,2; example 30; claims 1,3,34,37,49 *; | [E]WO03099773 (MILLENNIUM PHARM INC [US], et al) [E] 1-85* examples 32-36,38,44,65-68,101,102,105, 106,118-121,124,126,142; claims 1,9,10 *; | [X] - R. SILVESTRI, ET AL., "Anti-HIV-1 NNRT agents: acylamino pyrryl aryl sulphones (APASs) as truncated analogues of tricyclic PBTDs", MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY RESEARCH, BIRKHÄUSER, BOSTON, US, (2002), vol. 11, no. 4, ISSN 1054-2523, pages 195 - 218, XP008030138 [X] 1 * compounds 45,46 * | by applicant | WO9420142 | US2002012680 | WO0230358 | WO02101350 | - NEOTE ET AL., CELL, (1993), vol. 72, page 415425 | - VAN RIPER ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1993), vol. 177, pages 851 - 856 | - DAHINDEN, J. EXP. MED., (1994), vol. 179, pages 751 - 756 | - BERMAN, IMMUNOL. INVEST., (1988), vol. 17, pages 625 - 677 | - KAVANAUGH ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1991), vol. 146, pages 4149 - 4156 | - PANWALA ET AL., J IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 161, no. 10, pages 5733 - 44 | - DAVIDSON ET AL., J EXP MED., (1986), vol. 184, no. 1, pages 241 - 51 | - POWRIE ET AL., INT IMMUNOL, (1993), vol. 5, no. 11, pages 1461 - 71 | - TARGAN ET AL., N ENGL J MED., (1997), vol. 337, no. 15, pages 1029 - 35 | - KONTOYIANNIS ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1999), vol. 10, no. 3, pages 387 - 98 | - KOSIEWICZ ET AL., J CLIN INVEST., (2001), vol. 107, no. 6, pages 695 - 702 | WO1997US15915 |