EP1859757 - Composition and Method for manufacturing coloured blanks and dental moulded parts [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/48] | Method for manufacturing coloured blanks and dental moulded parts | ||
[2013/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.08.2014 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ivoclar Vivadent AG Bendererstrasse 2 9494 Schaan / LI | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ritzberger, Christian Spitalstr. 60 9472 Grabs / CH | 02 /
Apel, Elke Pradaweg 10 Oberschan / CH | 03 /
Höland, Wolfram, Prof. Dr. Im Aescherle 26 9494 Schaan / LI | 04 /
Rothbrust, Frank Mönchswaldstrasse 10 6820 Frastanz / AT | 05 /
Kerschbaumer, Harald Gugger-Nussbaum 35 6833 Klaus / AT | 06 /
Rheinberger, Volker M., Dr. Mareestrasse 34 9490 Vaduz / LI | [2013/41] |
Former [2007/48] | 01 /
Ritzberger, Christian Grienegg 20 6710 Nenzing / AT | ||
02 /
Apel, Elke Guschastrasse 19 9475 Sevelen / CH | |||
03 /
Höland, Wolfram, Prof. Dr. Im Aescherle 26 9494 Schaan / LI | |||
04 /
Rothbrust, Frank Mönchswaldstrasse 10 6820 Frastanz / AT | |||
05 /
Kerschbaumer, Harald Gugger-Nussbaum 35 6833 Klaus / AT | |||
06 /
Rheinberger, Volker M., Dr. Mareestrasse 34 9490 Vaduz / LI | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstraße 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/41] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07004776.6 | 08.03.2007 | [2007/48] | Priority number, date | DE20061024065 | 23.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006024065 | EP20060120608 | 13.09.2006 Original published format: EP 06120608 | [2007/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1859757 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1859757 | Date: | 16.07.2008 | [2008/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1859757 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61C13/00, A61C13/09, A61C5/10, C04B33/14, A61K6/00 | [2008/29] | CPC: |
A61C13/0022 (EP,US);
A61C5/77 (EP,US);
A61K6/804 (EP,US);
A61K6/813 (EP,US);
A61K6/818 (EP,US);
A61K6/822 (EP,US);
A61K6/833 (EP,US);
C04B35/486 (EP,US);
C04B35/488 (EP,US);
C04B35/6225 (EP,US);
C04B35/62665 (EP,US);
C04B35/62805 (EP,US);
C04B35/62815 (EP,US);
C04B35/62826 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3217 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3224 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3225 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3241 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3244 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3246 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3262 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3265 (EP,US);
C04B2235/3272 (EP,US);
C04B2235/443 (EP,US);
C04B2235/444 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5409 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6026 (EP,US);
C04B2235/604 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,US);
C04B2235/661 (EP,US);
C04B2235/72 (EP,US);
C04B2235/785 (EP,US);
C04B2235/95 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/48] | A61C13/00, A61C13/09, A61C5/10, C04B33/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Title | German: | Zusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von gefärbten Rohlingen und dentalen Formteilen | [2013/27] | English: | Composition and Method for manufacturing coloured blanks and dental moulded parts | [2013/27] | French: | Composition et Procédé destiné à la fabrication d'ébauches colorées et de pièces de formage dentaires | [2013/27] |
Former [2007/48] | Verfahren zur Herstellung von gefärbten Rohlingen und dentalen Formteilen | ||
Former [2007/48] | Method for manufacturing coloured blanks and dental moulded parts | ||
Former [2007/48] | Procédé destiné à la fabrication d'ébauches colorées et de pièces de formage dentaires | Examination procedure | 15.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 06.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.08.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 27.08.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11157242.6 / EP2359771 | EP11157243.4 / EP2353542 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 10.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.03.2007 | BG | 09.10.2013 | CY | 09.10.2013 | CZ | 09.10.2013 | DK | 09.10.2013 | EE | 09.10.2013 | ES | 09.10.2013 | FI | 09.10.2013 | LT | 09.10.2013 | LV | 09.10.2013 | MC | 09.10.2013 | MT | 09.10.2013 | PL | 09.10.2013 | RO | 09.10.2013 | SE | 09.10.2013 | SI | 09.10.2013 | SK | 09.10.2013 | TR | 09.10.2013 | GR | 10.01.2014 | IS | 09.02.2014 | PT | 10.02.2014 | AT | 08.03.2014 | IE | 08.03.2014 | LU | 08.03.2014 | BE | 31.03.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 08.03.2007 | |
BG | 09.10.2013 | ||
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
AT | 08.03.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
BE | 31.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 09.10.2013 | |
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
GR | 10.01.2014 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
AT | 08.03.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | BG | 09.10.2013 | |
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MC | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
AT | 08.03.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 09.10.2013 | |
CY | 09.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
AT | 08.03.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
MT | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
AT | 08.03.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
AT | 08.03.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/07] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
IE | 08.03.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
LU | 08.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
DK | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
CZ | 09.10.2013 | ||
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
RO | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
SK | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
EE | 09.10.2013 | ||
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
PT | 10.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 09.10.2013 | |
ES | 09.10.2013 | ||
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | ES | 09.10.2013 | |
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
LV | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 09.10.2013 | |
FI | 09.10.2013 | ||
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
PL | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 09.10.2013 | |
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
IS | 09.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 09.10.2013 | |
LT | 09.10.2013 | ||
SE | 09.10.2013 | ||
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 09.10.2013 | |
SI | 09.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 09.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0218853 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 22-29,39-42,47,48 * column 32, line 1 - line 4; example - *; | [X]US5011403 (SADOUN MICHAEL [FR], et al) [X] 1,3,6,8-12,15,16,21-29,39,41,42,47,48 * column 1, line 61 - column 3, line 12; example - *; | [DX]US5263858 (YOSHIDA MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [DX] 22-29,39-42,47,48 * example -; table - *; | [X]JPH0833650 (SHINAGAWA REFRACTORIES CO, et al) [X] 27-29,39,41,42 * example -; table - *; | [X]US5656564 (NAKAYAMA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [X] 22-29,39-42,47,48 * example 4; table 8 *; | [X]FR2781366 (NORTON DESMARQUEST FINE CERAMI [FR]) [X] 1,3-6,8,9,11,21-24,26-29,39,41,42,47,48 * page 5, line 1 - line 10; table 1 *; | [X]WO02085242 (CICERO DENTAL SYSTEMS B V [NL], et al) [X] 22-29,39,41-48 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6495072 (VAN DER ZEL JOSEPH MARIA [NL]) [X] 1,6,8,9,11-13,15,16 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [XY]US2003125189 (CASTRO DARREN T [US], et al) [X] 1,8-16 * paragraphs [0052] , [0055] , [0056] , [0058] * * the whole document * [Y] 2,17-20; | [XY]US2004152034 (CUMMINGS KEVIN M [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-9,11-14,17 * the whole document * [Y] 2,17-20; | [E]WO2007053084 (NOBEL BIOCARE SERVICES AG [CH], et al) [E] 22-29,39,41,42,47,48* the whole document * |