EP1835342 - Positive resist composition and pattern forming method using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.06.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizutani, Kazuyoshi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Iwato, Kaoru c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Kodama, Kunihiko c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 04 /
Tsuchihashi, Toru c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [2008/01] |
Former [2007/38] | 01 /
Mizutani, Kazuyoshi c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | ||
02 /
Iwato, Kaoru c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | |||
03 /
Kodama, Kunihiro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | |||
04 /
Tsuchihashi, Toru c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07005158.6 | 13.03.2007 | [2007/38] | Priority number, date | JP20060069382 | 14.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006069382 | JP20060247244 | 12.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006247244 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1835342 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1835342 | Date: | 04.06.2008 | [2008/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/039 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
G03F7/0392 (EP,US);
G03F7/0045 (KR);
G03F7/0397 (KR);
Y10S430/106 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S430/108 (EP,US);
Y10S430/111 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Title | German: | Positive Resistzusammensetzung und Verfahren zur Strukturformung damit | [2007/38] | English: | Positive resist composition and pattern forming method using the same | [2007/38] | French: | Composition de réserve positive et procédé de formation de motif l'utilisant | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 24.11.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 03.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/30] | 22.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/30] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.07.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5868743 ; | JPS5868743 [ ] (HITACHI LTD) [ ] * page 247; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0284868 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,10 * page 6; example 2 *; | [X]EP0337258 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-10 * page 9; example 1 *; | [AD]EP0663616 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-10 * page 60, lines 1-30 *; | [X]EP0829766 (SHIPLEY CO LLC [US]) [X] 1-10 * page 10, lines 25-28 * * page 14, lines 30-40 * * claims 1,14 *; | [X]EP1273969 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-10 * page 81, structure P-51 * * page 83, paragraph 193 * * page 84, paragraph 199 *; | [X]US2003022103 (LEE GEUN SU [KR], et al) [X] 1,10 * page 4; example 5 *; | [X] - ICHIMURA K. ET AL., "Highly sensitive positive resists for holography", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, USA, (1990), vol. 1212, pages 73 - 75, XP002475596 [X] 1,10 * page 73, abstract * * page 75; figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.17969 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1983, no. 22, Database accession no. 1983-52847K, XP002475597 & JPS5868743 A 19830423 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-10 * abstract * | Examination | EP1892575 | EP1906247 | by applicant | JPS5868743 | EP0284868 | EP0337258 | JPH07234511 | EP0829766 | EP1273969 | US2003022103 | - K. ICHIMURA; Y. OHE, "Practical Holography IV", SPIE, (1990), vol. 1212, pages 73 - 75 |