EP1835544 - Semiconductor device and manufacturing method of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co., Ltd. 2-5-5 Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-chi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | For all designated states Sanyo Semiconductor Co., Ltd. 1-1-1 Sakata Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma-ken 370-0596 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states Sanyo Electric Co. Ltd. 2-5-5 Keihanhondori 2-chome Moriguchi-chi Osaka 570-8677 / JP | ||
For all designated states Sanyo Semiconductor Co., Ltd. 1-1-1 Sakata Oizumi-machi Ora-gun Gunma-ken 370-0596 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yanagida, Masamichi 28-4-B202 Nishisinmachi, Ota-shi Gunma 373-0847 / JP | 02 /
Kameyama, Koujiro 402-4-A101 Uchigashima-cho, Ota-shi Gunma 373-0813 / JP | 03 /
Okada, Kikuo 1014 Shichihongi, Kamisato-machi, Kadama-gun Saitama 369-0306 / JP | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07005474.7 | 16.03.2007 | [2007/38] | Priority number, date | JP20060072645 | 16.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006072645 | JP20060215906 | 08.08.2006 Original published format: JP 2006215906 | JP20070042703 | 22.02.2007 Original published format: JP 2007042703 | [2007/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1835544 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1835544 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L29/78, H01L29/739, H01L29/417, H01L29/06, H01L29/08, H01L21/336 | [2008/36] | CPC: |
H01L29/7802 (EP,US);
H01L29/73 (KR);
H01L29/0653 (EP,US);
H01L29/0657 (EP,US);
H01L29/0696 (EP,US);
H01L29/0834 (EP,US);
H01L29/0886 (EP,US);
H01L29/41716 (EP,US);
H01L29/41741 (EP,US);
H01L29/41766 (EP,US);
H01L29/66734 (EP,US);
H01L29/7395 (EP,US);
H01L29/7397 (EP,US);
H01L29/7398 (EP,US);
H01L29/7809 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/38] | H01L29/78, H01L29/739, H01L29/417, H01L29/06, H01L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Halbleitervorrichtung und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2007/38] | English: | Semiconductor device and manufacturing method of the same | [2007/38] | French: | Dispositif semi-conducteur et son procédé de fabrication | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6263472 (SHARP KK) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,12-15,17-20 * abstract * * figure 1 *; | [X]JP2002016266 (SANKOSHA CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-9,11-20 * abstract * * figures 12-14 *; | [A]JP2002353452 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 12-14,19,20 * figure 1 *; | [X]US2004082116 (KUB FRANCIS J [US], et al) [X] 1-9,11-20 * figures 1-5,8,10 and associated text *; | [X]DE10333556 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6,9,12-15,17-20 * figures 1,3, and associated text *; | [X]US2005156283 (TOKUDA NORIFUMI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,4,7-20 * figures 1,24-37 and associated text *; | [E]EP1793426 (SHARP KK [JP]) [E] 1,2,4-6,9,12,14,15,18* figure 1 and associated text * |