EP1939762 - Method for managing content for a mobile device and remote gateway for managing content [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vodafone GmbH Ferdinand-Braun-Platz 1 40549 Düsseldorf / DE | [2014/38] |
Former [2008/27] | For all designated states Vodafone Holding GmbH Mannesmannufer 2 40213 Düsseldorf / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Maurice Ag Bellstraat 29 3620 Ianaken / BE | 02 /
Lahaije, Paul Luikerweg 51 5212 NH Maastricht / NL | [2008/27] | Representative(s) | Cullinane, Marietta Bettina, et al Patentanwälte Müller & Schubert Innere Wiener Straße 13 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/27] | Cullinane, Marietta Bettina, et al Patentanwälte Müller & Schubert Innere Wiener Straße 13 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07005799.7 | 21.03.2007 | [2008/27] | Priority number, date | EP20060027109 | 29.12.2006 Original published format: EP 06027109 | [2008/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1939762 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1939762 | Date: | 28.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, H04L29/08 | [2008/27] | CPC: |
G06F16/9577 (EP);
H04L67/02 (EP);
H04L67/565 (EP);
H04L67/5651 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/27] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Inhaltsverwaltung für eine mobile Vorrichtung und entferntes Gateway zur Inhaltsverwaltung | [2008/27] | English: | Method for managing content for a mobile device and remote gateway for managing content | [2008/27] | French: | Procédé de gestion du contenu d'un dispositif mobile et passerelle à distance pour gérer le contenu | [2008/27] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 28.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.03.2007 | AT | 28.05.2014 | BE | 28.05.2014 | BG | 28.05.2014 | CY | 28.05.2014 | CZ | 28.05.2014 | DK | 28.05.2014 | EE | 28.05.2014 | FI | 28.05.2014 | LT | 28.05.2014 | LV | 28.05.2014 | MC | 28.05.2014 | MT | 28.05.2014 | NL | 28.05.2014 | PL | 28.05.2014 | RO | 28.05.2014 | SE | 28.05.2014 | SI | 28.05.2014 | SK | 28.05.2014 | TR | 28.05.2014 | GR | 29.08.2014 | IS | 28.09.2014 | PT | 29.09.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
MC | 28.05.2014 | ||
MT | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
IS | 28.09.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
MC | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
IS | 28.09.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SI | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
IS | 28.09.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
NL | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
IS | 28.09.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
PL | 28.05.2014 | ||
RO | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
IS | 28.09.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
EE | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
SK | 28.05.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
IS | 28.09.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
BE | 28.05.2014 | ||
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
DK | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
IS | 28.09.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
IS | 28.09.2014 | ||
PT | 29.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 28.05.2014 | |
CY | 28.05.2014 | ||
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
IS | 28.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 28.05.2014 | |
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
LV | 28.05.2014 | ||
SE | 28.05.2014 | ||
GR | 29.08.2014 | ||
IS | 28.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 28.05.2014 | |
FI | 28.05.2014 | ||
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
IS | 28.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 28.05.2014 | |
LT | 28.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 28.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1227637 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] , [0018] *; | [X]US2006031528 (RAGUSEO DOMENICO [IT], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] - [0006] - [0012] , [0031]; figures 1a,2 *; | [X]US2006242273 (FIDUCCI THOMAS E [US]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0011] - [0013] - [0019] *; | [A] - UEMUKAI T ET AL, "A remote display environment: an integration of mobile and ubiquitous computing environments", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2002. WCNC2002. 2002 IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20020317), vol. 2, ISBN 0-7803-7376-6, pages 618 - 624, XP010585666 [A] * abstract * * page 1, column L - page 2, column R * | by applicant | US2003065715 |