EP1843175 - Synchronisation method for a light barrier and corresponding light barrier [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICK AG Erwin-Sick-Strasse 1 79183 Waldkirch / DE | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Merettig, Gerhard Siedlungsweg 1 79350 Sexau / DE | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07005821.9 | 21.03.2007 | [2007/41] | Priority number, date | DE20061016027 | 05.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006016027 | [2007/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1843175 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1843175 | Date: | 20.01.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01V8/12 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
G01V8/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Title | German: | Synchronisationsverfahren für eine Lichtschranke und entsprechenden Lichtschranke | [2007/41] | English: | Synchronisation method for a light barrier and corresponding light barrier | [2007/41] | French: | Procédé de synchronisation pour une barrière lumineuse et barrière lumineuse correspondante | [2007/41] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 30.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.10.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.01.2010 | CZ | 20.01.2010 | DK | 20.01.2010 | EE | 20.01.2010 | FI | 20.01.2010 | IE | 20.01.2010 | LT | 20.01.2010 | LV | 20.01.2010 | MT | 20.01.2010 | PL | 20.01.2010 | RO | 20.01.2010 | SE | 20.01.2010 | SI | 20.01.2010 | SK | 20.01.2010 | TR | 20.01.2010 | LU | 21.03.2010 | BE | 31.03.2010 | MC | 31.03.2010 | BG | 20.04.2010 | GR | 21.04.2010 | ES | 01.05.2010 | IS | 20.05.2010 | PT | 20.05.2010 | HU | 21.07.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
MT | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
LU | 21.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
HU | 21.07.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
MT | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
HU | 21.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/41] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
MT | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
MT | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 21.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
DK | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
IT | 21.03.2010 | ||
BE | 31.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CY | 20.01.2010 | |
CZ | 20.01.2010 | ||
EE | 20.01.2010 | ||
FI | 20.01.2010 | ||
IE | 20.01.2010 | ||
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
RO | 20.01.2010 | ||
SE | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
SK | 20.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.03.2010 | ||
BG | 20.04.2010 | ||
GR | 21.04.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | FI | 20.01.2010 | |
LT | 20.01.2010 | ||
LV | 20.01.2010 | ||
PL | 20.01.2010 | ||
SI | 20.01.2010 | ||
ES | 01.05.2010 | ||
IS | 20.05.2010 | ||
PT | 20.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | ES | 01.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4323910 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,16,18,19 * column 2, line 61 - column 7, line 33; figures 1-4 *; | [X]US5532472 (FURUTA NAOFUMI [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,16,18,19 * column 4, line 19 - column 5, line 21; figure 1 * * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 42; figure 2 *; | [X]DE19720176 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1-3,6,7,11,16,18,19 * column 4, line 29 - column 6, line 62; figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE19924351 (LEUZE ELECTRONIC GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,16,18,19* column 3, line 58 - column 6, line 22; figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP1248077 (OMRON ELECTRONICS MFG OF GERMA [DE]) [X] 1,2,6,16,18,19 * paragraphs [0036] - [0X38] - [0046] - [0049]; figures 1-4 * | by applicant | DE4323910 | DE19720176 |