EP1916032 - Manipulation of magnetic or magnetizable objects using combined magnetophoresis and dielectrophoresis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.05.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IMEC Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | For all designated states KATHOLIEKE UNIVERSITEIT LEUVEN Naamsestraat 22 3000 Leuven / BE | [2009/33] |
Former [2008/18] | For all designated states Interuniversitair Micro-Elektronica Centrum Kapeldreef 75 3001 Leuven / BE | ||
For all designated states KATHOLIEKE UNIVERSITEIT LEUVEN Naamsestraat 22 3000 Leuven / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Chengxun Tervuursevest 21/45 3001 Leuven / BE | 02 /
Lagae, Liesbet Oud-Strijdersstraat 109 3020 Herent / BE | [2008/18] | Representative(s) | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goën & Co Wetenschapspark Arenberg Gaston Geenslaan 9 3001 Heverlee / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goën & Co. Klein Dalenstraat 42A 3020 Winkelse / BE | ||
Former [2008/18] | Bird, William Edward, et al Bird Goen & Co Klein Dalenstraat 42A B-3020 Winksele / BE | Application number, filing date | 07005890.4 | 22.03.2007 | [2008/18] | Priority number, date | US20060854667P | 26.10.2006 Original published format: US 854667 P | [2008/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1916032 | Date: | 30.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1916032 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B03C5/02, B03C1/32 | [2008/18] | CPC: |
B03C1/32 (EP,US);
B03C5/026 (EP,US);
B03C2201/18 (EP,US);
B03C2201/22 (EP,US);
B03C2201/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/18] | Title | German: | Handhabung von magnetischen oder magnetisierbaren Objekten unter Verwendung von kombinierter Magnetophorese und Dielektrophorese | [2008/18] | English: | Manipulation of magnetic or magnetizable objects using combined magnetophoresis and dielectrophoresis | [2008/18] | French: | Manipulation d'objets magnétiques ou magnétisables par magnétophorèse et diélectrophorèse combinées | [2008/18] | Examination procedure | 26.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/18] | 16.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.06.2010 | BE | 30.06.2010 | CY | 30.06.2010 | CZ | 30.06.2010 | DK | 30.06.2010 | EE | 30.06.2010 | FI | 30.06.2010 | HU | 30.06.2010 | IT | 30.06.2010 | LT | 30.06.2010 | LV | 30.06.2010 | MT | 30.06.2010 | NL | 30.06.2010 | PL | 30.06.2010 | RO | 30.06.2010 | SE | 30.06.2010 | SI | 30.06.2010 | SK | 30.06.2010 | TR | 30.06.2010 | BG | 30.09.2010 | GR | 01.10.2010 | ES | 11.10.2010 | IS | 30.10.2010 | PT | 02.11.2010 | IE | 22.03.2011 | LU | 22.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
MT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
TR | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 22.03.2011 | ||
LU | 22.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
MT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
BG | 30.09.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 22.03.2011 | ||
LU | 22.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
MT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 22.03.2011 | ||
LU | 22.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
MT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
IE | 22.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
MT | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/33] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
ES | 11.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
BE | 30.06.2010 | ||
CY | 30.06.2010 | ||
CZ | 30.06.2010 | ||
DK | 30.06.2010 | ||
EE | 30.06.2010 | ||
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
IT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
NL | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
RO | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
SK | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | ||
IS | 30.10.2010 | ||
PT | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 30.06.2010 | |
FI | 30.06.2010 | ||
LT | 30.06.2010 | ||
LV | 30.06.2010 | ||
PL | 30.06.2010 | ||
SE | 30.06.2010 | ||
SI | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 01.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9416821 (SCIENT GENERICS LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-27 * page 17, lines 1-7 *; | [A]US5454472 (BENECKE WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1-27 * claim 5 *; | [DA]WO0196857 (UNIV TEXAS [US], et al) [DA] 1-27* abstract *; | [X]US2002036142 (GASCOYNE PETER [US], et al) [X] 1,17,26 * claims 1,3 *; | [X]WO0228523 (AVIVA BIOSCIENCES CORP [US]) [X] 1-27 * page 64, paragraph 4; figure 6 * |