EP1837399 - Anticancer agent [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | For all designated states Tokyo Medical and Dental University 1-5-45, Yushima Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
For all designated states Tokyo Medical and Dental University 1-5-45, Yushima Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imoto, Issei c/o Tokyo Medical and Dental University 1-5-45, Yushima, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8510 / JP | 02 /
Inazawa, Johji c/o Tokyo Medical and Dental University 1-5-45, Yushima, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8510 / JP | 03 /
Izumi, Hiroyuki c/o Tokyo Kyosai Hospital 2-3-8, Nakameguro, Meguro-ku Tokyo 153-8934 / JP | 04 /
Yokoi, Sana c/o Tokyo Medical and Dental University 1-5-45, Yushima, Bunkyo-ku Tokyo 113-8510 / JP | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/39] | Hiebl, Inge Elisabeth Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07005921.7 | 22.03.2007 | [2007/39] | Priority number, date | JP20060078786 | 22.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006078786 | [2007/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1837399 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1837399 | Date: | 22.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47, C12Q1/68, A61K31/711, A61K38/17, A61K39/395 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
C07K14/705 (EP,US);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/39] | Title | German: | Antikrebsmittel | [2007/39] | English: | Anticancer agent | [2007/39] | French: | Agent anti-cancer | [2007/39] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/04] | 14.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.11.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.05.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.05.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2007 | AT | 22.06.2011 | BE | 22.06.2011 | CY | 22.06.2011 | CZ | 22.06.2011 | DK | 22.06.2011 | EE | 22.06.2011 | FI | 22.06.2011 | IT | 22.06.2011 | LT | 22.06.2011 | LV | 22.06.2011 | MT | 22.06.2011 | NL | 22.06.2011 | PL | 22.06.2011 | RO | 22.06.2011 | SE | 22.06.2011 | SI | 22.06.2011 | SK | 22.06.2011 | TR | 22.06.2011 | BG | 22.09.2011 | GR | 23.09.2011 | ES | 03.10.2011 | IS | 22.10.2011 | PT | 24.10.2011 | IE | 22.03.2012 | LU | 22.03.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
TR | 22.06.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.03.2012 | ||
LU | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
TR | 22.06.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
MT | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
BG | 22.09.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
ES | 03.10.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
IE | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
DK | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
IT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
PL | 22.06.2011 | ||
RO | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
SK | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
CZ | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
PT | 24.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
EE | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
IS | 22.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
BE | 22.06.2011 | ||
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
NL | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 22.06.2011 | |
CY | 22.06.2011 | ||
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
LV | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
SI | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 22.06.2011 | |
FI | 22.06.2011 | ||
LT | 22.06.2011 | ||
SE | 22.06.2011 | ||
GR | 23.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 22.06.2011 | |
SE | 22.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO02072771 (CURAGEN CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO2006009915 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]); | by applicant | JPH0646841 | WO2006009915 |