EP1802016 - A subscriber unit and method for use in a wireless communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2010/24] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Odenwalder, Joseph P. c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/26] | 01 /
Odenwalder, Joseph P. 14967 Rancho Real Del Mar, CA 92014 / US | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07006092.6 | 30.06.1998 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | US19970886604 | 01.07.1997 Original published format: US 886604 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1802016 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1802016 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1802016 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04J11/00, H04B1/707 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
H04W52/60 (EP,US);
H04B1/707 (EP,FI,KR,US);
H04J13/0022 (KR);
H04B7/2628 (KR);
H04B7/264 (EP,FI,US);
H04J13/004 (FI);
H04J13/0044 (EP,FI,US);
H04J13/0048 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0059 (EP,FI,US);
H04L1/0071 (EP,FI,US);
H04W52/54 (EP,US);
H04B2201/70701 (EP,US);
H04J13/0077 (EP,US);
H04J13/102 (EP,US);
H04J13/18 (EP,US);
H04W52/34 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2007/26] | Title | German: | Teilnehmereinheit und Verfahren zur Verwendung in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationssystem | [2007/26] | English: | A subscriber unit and method for use in a wireless communication system | [2007/26] | French: | Unité d'abonné et procédé d'utilisation dans un système de communication sans fil | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 11.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98931756.5 / EP0993740 | Divisional application(s) | EP10003173.1 / EP2202902 | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 23.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 05.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.06.2010 | CY | 16.06.2010 | DK | 16.06.2010 | CH | 30.06.2010 | LI | 30.06.2010 | LU | 30.06.2010 | MC | 30.06.2010 | GR | 17.09.2010 | PT | 18.10.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2011/20] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
CH | 30.06.2010 | ||
LI | 30.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
DK | 16.06.2010 | ||
MC | 30.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | ||
PT | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 16.06.2010 | |
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
GR | 17.09.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5103459 (GILHOUSEN KLEIN S [US], et al) [A] 1-13,27-29 * abstract * * page 12, lines 36-45 *; | [A]WO9503652 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [A] 1-13,27-29 * abstract * * page 3, lines 13-38 * * page 4, lines 1-18 * * page 7, line 37 - page 8, line 8 * * page 11, lines 14-16 * * page 11, lines 30-38 * * page 12, lines 29-36 * * page 13, lines 16-20 *; | [X]EP0693830 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 14-26 * column 6, line 57 - column 7, line 41; figure 1 *; | [X]JPH098770 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 14-26* abstract * | by applicant | WO9503652 |