EP1809045 - Image decoding apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2007/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Isu, Yoshimi c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 02 /
Sekiguchi, Shunichi c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 03 /
Asai, Kohtaro c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 04 /
Nishikawa, Hirofumi c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 05 /
Kuroda, Shinichi c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | 06 /
Hasegawa, Yuri c/o Mitsubishi Denki Kabushiki Kaisha 7-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8310 / JP | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07006268.2 | 23.10.1997 | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1809045 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1809045 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
H04N21/4385 (EP);
H04N19/00 (EP);
H04N19/12 (EP);
H04N19/136 (EP);
H04N19/20 (EP);
H04N19/40 (EP);
H04N19/44 (EP);
H04N19/51 (EP);
H04N19/513 (EP);
H04N19/517 (EP);
H04N19/61 (EP);
H04N21/234318 (EP);
H04N21/2389 (EP);
H04N21/44012 (EP);
H04N21/440218 (EP);
H04N19/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/29] | H04N7/44, H04N7/24, H04N7/26, H04N7/50 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2007/29] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bilddekodierung | [2007/29] | English: | Image decoding apparatus | [2007/29] | French: | Appareil de décodage d'image | [2007/29] | Examination procedure | 19.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/29] | 06.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03090051.8 / EP1328125 | EP05008900.2 / EP1565004 | EP97909609.6 / EP1032219 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH09139937 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970930), vol. 1997, no. 09, & JP09139937 A 19970527 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1 * the whole document * |