EP1803416 - Vascular embolic filter exchange devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre Bush Hill Bay Street St. Michael / BB | [2011/20] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited The Corporate Centre Bush Hill, Bay Street St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Salahieh, Amr 18729 Metler Court Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 02 /
Demond, Jackson 149 Plateau Avenue Santa Cruz, CA 95060 / US | 03 /
Krolik, Jeff 1198 Longfellow Avenue Campbell, CA 95008 / US | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/27] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07006547.9 | 23.09.2002 | [2007/27] | Priority number, date | US20010045628 | 19.10.2001 Original published format: US 45628 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1803416 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1803416 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1803416 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/01 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
A61F2/011 (EP,US);
A61F2002/018 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0008 (EP,US);
A61F2230/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2007/27] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Auswechseln von Gefäßemboliefiltern | [2007/27] | English: | Vascular embolic filter exchange devices | [2007/27] | French: | Dispositifs d'échange de filtre embolique vasculaire | [2007/27] | Examination procedure | 04.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 10.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02766340.0 / EP1439797 | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.05.2011 | BE | 18.05.2011 | CY | 18.05.2011 | CZ | 18.05.2011 | DK | 18.05.2011 | EE | 18.05.2011 | FI | 18.05.2011 | SE | 18.05.2011 | SK | 18.05.2011 | TR | 18.05.2011 | BG | 18.08.2011 | GR | 19.08.2011 | PT | 19.09.2011 | LU | 23.09.2011 | CH | 30.09.2011 | LI | 30.09.2011 | MC | 30.09.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
BG | 18.08.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
LU | 23.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
LU | 23.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.09.2011 | ||
LI | 30.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
DK | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
SK | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
CZ | 18.05.2011 | ||
EE | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 18.05.2011 | |
BE | 18.05.2011 | ||
CY | 18.05.2011 | ||
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 18.05.2011 | |
FI | 18.05.2011 | ||
SE | 18.05.2011 | ||
GR | 19.08.2011 | ||
PT | 19.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | PT | 19.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6142987 (TSUGITA ROSS S [US]) [A] 1,13,21 * column 5, line 48 - line 62; figures 1G,1K *; | [A]WO0076390 (ARTERIA MEDICAL SCIENCE INC [US]) [A] 1,13,21* page 20, line 3 - page 21, line 6; figure - * | by applicant | US6142987 |