EP1976297 - Method and system for autimatically selecting television channels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.07.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2010 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 11.08.2010 [2010/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke KPN N.V. Maanplein 55 2516 CK The Hague / NL | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koster, Arian Rietveld, 20 3641 - GS Mijdrecht / NL | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria Koninklijke KPN N.V. Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 25110 3001 HC Rotterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Wuyts, Koenraad Maria Koninklijke KPN N.V., Intellectual Property Group, P.O. Box 95321 2509 CH Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 07006551.1 | 29.03.2007 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1976297 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24, H04N5/00 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/4383 (EP,US);
H04N21/4394 (EP,US);
H04N21/44222 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur automatischen Auswahl von Fernsehkanälen | [2008/40] | English: | Method and system for autimatically selecting television channels | [2008/40] | French: | Procédé et système de sélection automatique de chaînes de télévision | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 29.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/31] | 09.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/32] | 17.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9831149 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 7 * abstract * * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 18 * * page 9, line 2 - line 8 * * page 11, line 1 - line 8 * * page 11, line 20 - line 23 * * page 14, line 15 - line 22 * * page 15, line 7 - line 9 * * page 16, line 24 - line 26 * * page 17, line 15 - line 16 * * page 20, line 9 - line 11 * * page 21, line 1 - line 8 * * page 21, line 18 - line 24 * * page 22, line 9 - line 16 * * claims 1,3,12,15,25,29,37,46,53,54,58 * * figures 2,5-7 *; | [XY]US2003018967 (GORBATOV EUGENE [US], et al) [X] 7 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0013] , [0015] , [0017] , [0018] , [0024] - [0028] * * claims 1,6,10,18,21,22,26,28-30,32,33 * [Y] 1-6; | [A]WO03010965 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 1, line 25 - page 2, line 5 * * page 3, line 7 - line 10 * * page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 4 * * page 4, line 8 - line 27 * * page 5, line 4 - line 8 * * page 5, line 20 - line 22 * * page 6, line 24 - line 30 ** figures 1,3b *; | [A]WO03036969 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 1, line 23 - page 2, line 7 * * page 3, line 24 - line 27 * * page 4, line 4 - line 9 * * page 4, line 21 - line 26 * * page 5, line 3 - line 6 * * claims 1,2,5,6,8,9 *; | [A]WO2004049705 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * page 1, line 19 - page 2, line 2 * * page 2, line 32 - page 3, line 23 * * page 8, line 24 - page 9, line 1 * * page 9, line 18 - page 9, line 24 * * page 10, line 18 - line 22 * * claims 1,7 *; | [Y]CA2498364 (DNA 13 INC [CA]) [Y] 1-6 * abstract * * page 2, line 19 - page 6, line 12 * * page 7, line 14 - line 26 * * page 8, line 16 - line 18 * * page 9, line 10 - line 12 * * page 9, line 17 - line 19 * * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 2 * * page 10, line 18 - line 21 * * page 14, line 11 - line 12 * * page 14, line 16 - line 18 * * page 18, line 7 - line 19 * * claims 1,7,19,27,37,38 * * figures 1,3,9 * * page 18, line 26 - line 28 * * page 19, line 7 - line 9 * |