EP1841149 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EXTENDING WIRELESS PERSONAL AREA NETWORKS USING CONFERENCING CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/40] | System, method and apparatus for extending wireless personal area networks using conferencing connection | ||
[2017/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.06.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polycom, Inc. 6001 America Center Drive San Jose, CA 95002 / US | [2017/44] |
Former [2013/34] | For all designated states Polycom, Inc. 6001 America Center Drive San Jose, CA 95002 / US | ||
Former [2007/40] | For all designated states POLYCOM, INC. 4750 Willow Road Pleasanton California 94588 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilson, George "Jed" D., Jr. 8201 Amasia Cove Austin, Texas 78729 / US | 02 /
Nogarede, Katherine D. 1303 Goeth Circle Austin, Texas 78746 / US | 03 /
Rousch, Charles Gregory 9713 Derecho Drive Austin, Texas 78737 / US | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Knöner, Gregor, et al Kahler Käck Mollekopf Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten mbB Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg am Lech / DE | [2017/44] |
Former [2007/40] | Käck, Jürgen Patentanwälte Kahler Käck Mollekopf Vorderer Anger 239 86899 Landsberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07006660.0 | 30.03.2007 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | US20060278321 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: US 278321 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1841149 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1841149 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1841149 | Date: | 01.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18 | [2014/01] | CPC: |
H04L65/4038 (EP,US);
H04L12/1813 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/51 (EP,US);
H04L69/24 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/40] | H04L12/56 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [2014/29] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERWEITERUNG VON DRAHTLOSEN PERSÖNLICHEN NETZWERKEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER KONFERENZVERBINDUNG | [2017/27] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR EXTENDING WIRELESS PERSONAL AREA NETWORKS USING CONFERENCING CONNECTION | [2017/27] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉTENDRE LES RÉSEAUX PERSONNELS SANS FIL UTILISANT UNE CONNEXION DE VISIOCONFÉRENCE | [2017/27] |
Former [2007/40] | System, Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Erweiterung von drahtlosen persönlichen Netzwerken unter Verwendung einer Konferenzverbindung | ||
Former [2007/40] | System, method and apparatus for extending wireless personal area networks using conferencing connection | ||
Former [2007/40] | Système, procédé et appareil pour étendre les réseaux personnels sans fil utilisant une connexion de visioconférence | Examination procedure | 30.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/40] | 06.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2014 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 04.08.2014 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 19.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 01.11.2017 | NL | 01.11.2017 | [2018/41] |
Former [2018/23] | NL | 01.11.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004034723 (GIROTI SUDHIR K [US]) [X] 1-7,10-14,16-20,22-25 * abstract * * page 1, paragraphs 3-8 * * page 4, paragraph 65 * * page 5, paragraphs 74,75 * [I] 8,9; | [X]JP2005086690 (RICOH KK) [X] 1,5,8,10,14,15,20,21* paragraphs [0038] , [0039] , [0047] , [0048] , [0058] , [0059] *; | [XAI]EP1608128 (MITEL NETWORKS CORP [CA]) [X] 1-8,10-14,17,20,23 * abstract * * column 1, paragraph 2 * * column 4, paragraphs 10,11 * * column 6, paragraph 18 * * column 9, paragraphs 31,33 * * column 11, paragraph 40 * [A] 15,21 [I] 9,16,18,19,22,24,25 |