EP1975962 - Switching device, in particular electromagnetic switching device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): RO | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Drexler, Johann Hochrainstrasse 96 92421 Schwandorf / DE | 02 /
Oberleiter, Alexander Am Schloss 7 91230 Thalheim / DE | 03 /
Schlegl, Peter Zum Birkenschlag 19A 90518 Altdorf / DE | 04 /
Streble, Daniela Regerstrasse 39 92224 Amberg / DE | [2008/40] | Application number, filing date | 07006734.3 | 30.03.2007 | [2008/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1975962 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1975962 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01H50/02 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
H01H50/021 (EP);
H01H2071/0278 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | Schaltgerät, insbesondere elektromagnetisches Schaltgerät | [2008/40] | English: | Switching device, in particular electromagnetic switching device | [2008/40] | French: | Commutateur, en particulier commutateur électromagnétique | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 10.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2007 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 01.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.06.2009 | CZ | 24.06.2009 | DK | 24.06.2009 | EE | 24.06.2009 | FI | 24.06.2009 | IE | 24.06.2009 | LT | 24.06.2009 | LV | 24.06.2009 | MT | 24.06.2009 | NL | 24.06.2009 | PL | 24.06.2009 | RO | 24.06.2009 | SI | 24.06.2009 | SK | 24.06.2009 | TR | 24.06.2009 | BG | 24.09.2009 | SE | 24.09.2009 | GR | 25.09.2009 | ES | 05.10.2009 | IS | 24.10.2009 | PT | 24.10.2009 | HU | 25.12.2009 | [2014/34] |
Former [2012/47] | CY | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
MT | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
TR | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
HU | 25.12.2009 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
MT | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
HU | 25.12.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 24.06.2009 | |
CZ | 24.06.2009 | ||
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
MT | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
MT | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
GR | 25.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
DK | 24.06.2009 | ||
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
IE | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
BG | 24.09.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
PT | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | CZ | 24.06.2009 | |
EE | 24.06.2009 | ||
FI | 24.06.2009 | ||
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
NL | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SK | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | ||
ES | 05.10.2009 | ||
IS | 24.10.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | FI | 24.06.2009 | |
LT | 24.06.2009 | ||
LV | 24.06.2009 | ||
PL | 24.06.2009 | ||
SI | 24.06.2009 | ||
SE | 24.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3503292 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5-9 * page 5, line 33 - page 6, line 25; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0453918 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,7,8 * figure 3 *; | [A]DE19618736 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] * figure - *; | [A]WO9954980 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]DE102005026714 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] * the whole document * |