EP1842504 - Anchor element for attaching the rod of a device for treating a human or animal spine to a vertebra [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Metz-Stavenhagen, Peter Schlossstrasse 24 34537 Bad Wildungen / DE | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Walther Bayer Faber Patentanwälte PartGmbB Heimradstraße 2 34130 Kassel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | WALTHER, WALTHER & HINZ Patentanwälte - European Patent Attorneys Heimradstrasse 2 34130 Kassel / DE | Application number, filing date | 07006816.8 | 19.05.2003 | [2007/41] | Priority number, date | DE20022007852U | 21.05.2002 Original published format: DE 20207852 U | DE20022007850U | 21.05.2002 Original published format: DE 20207850 U | [2007/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1842504 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1842504 | Date: | 19.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
A61B17/7032 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Title | German: | Verankerungselement zur Befestigung eines Stabes an einem Wirbelknochen | [2007/41] | English: | Anchor element for attaching the rod of a device for treating a human or animal spine to a vertebra | [2007/41] | French: | Elément dýancrage destiné à la fixation d'une barre d'un dispositif pour régler une colonne vertébrale humaine ou animale sur une vertèbre | [2007/41] | Examination procedure | 23.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 06.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03727236.6 / EP1509147 | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.11.2008 | CZ | 19.11.2008 | DK | 19.11.2008 | EE | 19.11.2008 | FI | 19.11.2008 | IE | 19.11.2008 | RO | 19.11.2008 | SI | 19.11.2008 | SK | 19.11.2008 | TR | 19.11.2008 | BG | 19.02.2009 | SE | 19.02.2009 | GR | 20.02.2009 | PT | 20.04.2009 | LU | 19.05.2009 | HU | 20.05.2009 | BE | 31.05.2009 | MC | 31.05.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 19.11.2008 | |
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
LU | 19.05.2009 | ||
HU | 20.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 19.11.2008 | |
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
LU | 19.05.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CZ | 19.11.2008 | |
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
GR | 20.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CZ | 19.11.2008 | |
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
BE | 31.05.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | CZ | 19.11.2008 | |
DK | 19.11.2008 | ||
EE | 19.11.2008 | ||
FI | 19.11.2008 | ||
IE | 19.11.2008 | ||
RO | 19.11.2008 | ||
SI | 19.11.2008 | ||
SK | 19.11.2008 | ||
BG | 19.02.2009 | ||
SE | 19.02.2009 | ||
PT | 20.04.2009 | ||
MC | 31.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | FI | 19.11.2008 | |
SI | 19.11.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]EP0885598 (HOWMEDICA GMBH [DE]) [DY] 1-3 * abstract *; | [A]US6251112 (JACKSON ROGER P [US]) [A] 1-3 * abstract *; | [Y]US6258090 (JACKSON ROGER P [US]) [Y] 1-3 * abstract * * column 5, lines 50-61 *; | [A]EP1190678 (DEPUY ACROMED INC [US]) [A] 1-3* abstract * | by applicant | DE9202745U | DE9402839U | WO9501132 | DE29710484U | EP0885598 |