EP1843233 - Localisation and positioning system for guiding a mobile entity in relation to one or more other objects [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 18.01.2012 [2012/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITPOOL Systems 71 Avenue Edouard Herriot 92350 Le Plessis Robinson / FR | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Louvel, Philippe 71 avenue Herriot 92350 Le Plessis Robinson / FR | [2007/41] | Application number, filing date | 07006925.7 | 03.04.2007 | [2007/41] | Priority number, date | FR20060003017 | 06.04.2006 Original published format: FR 0603017 | [2007/41] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1843233 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1843233 | Date: | 15.12.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G05D1/02, G01S5/16, G01S5/18, G01S17/87 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
G01S17/87 (EP);
G01S17/74 (EP);
G01S5/16 (EP);
G01S5/18 (EP);
G05D1/0225 (EP);
G05D1/0236 (EP);
G05D1/0255 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [2008/25] |
Former [2007/41] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lokalisierungs- und Positionierungssystem zur Lenkung einer Mobileinheit in Bezug auf ein oder mehrere andere Objekte | [2007/41] | English: | Localisation and positioning system for guiding a mobile entity in relation to one or more other objects | [2007/41] | French: | Système de localisation et positionnement pour le guidage d'une entité mobile par rapport à un ou plusieurs autres objets | [2007/41] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/30] | 20.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time | 30.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/47] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 14.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 11.08.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.09.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 15.12.2010 | ES | 26.03.2011 | [2012/03] |
Former [2011/35] | ES | 26.03.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4026654 (BEAURAIN PIERRE) [A] 1-9 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 68 * * column 13, line 51 - column 16, line 16; figures 1,8,12 *; | [A]US5815825 (TACHIBANA AKIHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 50; figures 1-6 *; | [YA]US2003191602 (LEE YONG-KWUN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-8 * paragraphs [0030] - [0033]; figures 3A-3C * [A] 5,9; | [YA]US2005190427 (STEINSIEK FRANK [DE], et al) [Y] 1-4,6-8 * the whole document * [A] 5,9; | [A] - DURIEU C ET AL, "LOCALIZATION OF A MOBILE ROBOT WITH BEACONS TAKING ERRONEOUS DATA INTO ACCOUNT", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ROBOTICS AND AUTOMATION. SCOTTSDALE, MAY 15 - 19, 1989, WASHINGTON, IEEE COMP. SOC. PRESS, US, (19890515), VOL. 2, ISBN 0-8186-1938-4, pages 1062 - 1068, XP000076146 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ROBOT.1989.100122 | by applicant | US2003191602 | DE10252647 | US2005021178 | US2005137748 | US2005190427 |