EP1847190 - Disposable operating gown for protection against fluids or microorganisms [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paul Hartmann Aktiengesellschaft Paul-Hartmann-Strasse 12 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [2007/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hietkamp, Peter Hermann Löns Weg 3 89518 Heidenheim / DE | [2007/43] | Application number, filing date | 07006927.3 | 03.04.2007 | [2007/43] | Priority number, date | DE20061018659 | 21.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006018659 | [2007/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1847190 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1847190 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A41D13/12 | [2007/43] | CPC: |
A41D13/1209 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/43] | Title | German: | Wegwerfbarer Operationsmantel zum Schutz vor Flüssigkeiten oder Mikroorganismen | [2007/43] | English: | Disposable operating gown for protection against fluids or microorganisms | [2007/43] | French: | Gaine opérationnelle jetable destinée à protéger contre les liquides ou les microorganismes | [2007/43] | Examination procedure | 13.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 09.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.01.2011 | CZ | 26.01.2011 | DK | 26.01.2011 | EE | 26.01.2011 | FI | 26.01.2011 | HU | 26.01.2011 | IE | 26.01.2011 | LT | 26.01.2011 | LV | 26.01.2011 | MT | 26.01.2011 | NL | 26.01.2011 | PL | 26.01.2011 | RO | 26.01.2011 | SE | 26.01.2011 | SI | 26.01.2011 | SK | 26.01.2011 | TR | 26.01.2011 | LU | 03.04.2011 | BG | 26.04.2011 | GR | 27.04.2011 | BE | 30.04.2011 | CH | 30.04.2011 | LI | 30.04.2011 | MC | 30.04.2011 | IS | 26.05.2011 | PT | 26.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
MT | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
TR | 26.01.2011 | ||
LU | 03.04.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
MT | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
LU | 03.04.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
MT | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
BE | 30.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/07] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
MT | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
CH | 30.04.2011 | ||
LI | 30.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
MT | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
MC | 30.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | LT | 26.01.2011 | |
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3868728 (KRZEWINSKI HENRIETTA K) [X] 1 * column 1, line 52 - column 2, line 12; figures 7,8 *; | [A]US5901706 (GRIESBACH HENRY L [US], et al) [A] 10-12 * the whole document *; | [X]US6235659 (MCAMISH LARRY [US], et al) [X] 1-31 * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 4; figure 1 *; | [X]DE20117174U (CHOU SU JEN [TW]) [X] 1 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line L; figures 1,2,6-8 *; | [PA]US2006090237 (DABNEY NANCY L [US], et al) [PA] 7-9* the whole document * |