EP1977784 - Implantable medical device and method for LV coronary sinus lead implant site optimization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.12.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Biotronik CRM Patent AG Neuhofstrasse 4 6341 Baar / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | For all designated states BIOTRONIK CRM Patent AG Neuhofstrasse 4 6341 Baar / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lippert, Michael, Dr. Am Weinberg-Plateau 5 91522 Ansbach / DE | 02 /
Czygan, Gerald, Dr. Hutweide 60 91054 Buckenhof / DE | 03 /
Paule, Stefan, Dr. Ahornweg 9 96117 Drosendorf / DE | [2008/41] | Representative(s) | Galander, Marcus, et al Biotronik Corporate Services SE Corporate Intellectual Property Sieversufer 7 - 9 12359 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Corporate Intellectual Properties Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2008/41] | Lindner-Vogt, Karin L. Biotronik GmbH & Co. KG Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 07007048.7 | 04.04.2007 | [2008/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1977784 | Date: | 08.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/362, A61N1/08, A61N1/365, A61B5/053 | [2008/41] | CPC: |
A61N1/3627 (EP,US);
A61N1/368 (EP,US);
A61N1/37 (EP,US);
A61N1/37241 (EP,US);
A61B5/053 (EP,US);
A61N1/3682 (EP,US);
A61N2001/0585 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/41] | Title | German: | Implantierbare medizinische Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Optimierung des Implantatortes für eine linksventrikuläre Koronarsinuselektrode | [2008/41] | English: | Implantable medical device and method for LV coronary sinus lead implant site optimization | [2008/41] | French: | Dispositif médical implantable et procédé pour l'optimisation du site d'implantation d'une électrode du sinus coronaire VG | [2008/41] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 27.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/01] | 01.09.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 16.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5224475 (BERG GARY L [US], et al) [A] 1,2,21 * the whole document *; | [XY]US6654639 (LU RICHARD [US]) [X] 1-9,15-20 * column 3, line 59 - column 14, line 30; figures 1,2 * [Y] 10-14,21; | [AY]EP1459785 (PACESETTER INC [US]) [A] 1-9,15-20 * the whole document * [Y] 10-14,21; | [A]US2004260351 (HOLMSTROM NILS [SE], et al) [A] 1,2,21* the whole document * |