EP1845516 - Liquid crystal TV set and liquid crystal display unit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2013 Database last updated on 09.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2013 [2013/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, Nakagaito 7-chome Daito-shi Osaka / JP | [2007/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ogino, Yoshihiro c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, 7-Chome, Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka / JP | [2012/18] |
Former [2007/42] | 01 /
Ogino, Yoshihiro c/o Funai Electric Co., Ltd. 7-1, 7-Chome, Nakagaito Daito-shi Osaka / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/42] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07007451.3 | 11.04.2007 | [2007/42] | Priority number, date | JP20060110108 | 12.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006110108 | [2007/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1845516 | Date: | 17.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1845516 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/00 | [2007/42] | CPC: |
G09G5/00 (EP,US);
G09G3/36 (EP,US);
G09G2330/02 (EP,US);
G09G2330/021 (EP,US);
G09G2330/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, PL [2008/26] |
Former [2007/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallfernseher und Flüssigkristallanzeigeeinheit | [2007/42] | English: | Liquid crystal TV set and liquid crystal display unit | [2007/42] | French: | Appareil de télévision à cristaux liquides et unité d'affichage à cristaux liquides | [2007/42] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.12.2007 | Opposition(s) | 20.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6219016 (LEE HYONG-GON [KR]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [DA]JP2003122311 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [DA] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [A]US2004017112 (KIM JUNG-HWAN [KR], et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]US2005127983 (TAKAGI NOBUTOMO [JP], et al) [Y] 3 * the whole document *; | [X] - ADVANCED SILICON SA, "ASTLC5301A", INTERNET ARTICLE - DATA SHEET, (20030506), URL: http://www.advancedsilicon.com/uploads/media/ASTLC5301A_v1.0.pdf, XP002439907 [X] 2-4 * the whole document * | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "Plasma TV Service Manual", INTERNET ARTICLE, (20031024), URL: http://www.eserviceinfo.com/downloadsm/7977/philips_Plasma_Service_Manual.html, XP002439954 [Y] 3,4 * page 61 * | [Y] - ANONYMOUS, "Schematics and PWB s", PHILIPS EM2E SERVICE MANUAL, (20060312), URL: http://www.eserviceinfo.com/downloadsm/20138/PHILIPS_PW8506%20and%20others.html, XP002439908 [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0007] * | [X] - TEXAS INSTRUMENTS, "LTPS-LCD bias power supply, triple charge pump", INTERNET ARTICLE - TPS65110, TPS65111, (2003), URL: http://focus.ti.com/lit/ds/symlink/tps65110.pdf, XP002439909 [X] 2 * page 10 - page 12 * |