EP1980553 - 4-(3-aminobenzoyl)-1-methyl pyrazoles and their application as herbicides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer CropScience Aktiengesellschaft Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | For all designated states Bayer CropScience Aktiengesellschaft Alfred-Nobel-Strasse 50 40789 Monheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heinemann, Ines Ubierstrasse 13 65719 Hofheim / DE | 02 /
van Almsick, Andreas Am Breul 4b 61184 Karben / DE | 03 /
Willms, Lothar Königsteiner Strasse 50 65719 Hofheim / DE | 04 /
Schmitt, Monika Glauburgstrasse 85 60318 Frankfurt a. M. / DE | 05 /
Dittgen, Jan Burgstrasse 26 65316 Frankfurt a. M. / DE | [2008/42] | Application number, filing date | 07007490.1 | 12.04.2007 | [2008/42] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1980553 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D231/20, A01N43/56 | [2008/42] | CPC: |
C07D231/20 (EP,BR,US);
A01N43/56 (BR);
C07D409/12 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/26] |
Former [2008/42] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | 4-(3-Aminobenzoyl)-1-methylpyrazole und ihre Verwendung als Herbizide | [2008/42] | English: | 4-(3-aminobenzoyl)-1-methyl pyrazoles and their application as herbicides | [2008/42] | French: | 4-(3-Aminobenzoyl)-1-méthylpyrazole et son utilisation en tant qu'herbicide | [2008/42] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 29.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9741106 (ISHIHARA SANGYO KAISHA [JP], et al) [A] 1-9 * example - *; | [YD]WO9842678 (DOW AGROSCIENCES LLC [US]) [YD] 1-9 * example - *; | [YD]JPH11292849 (NIPPON SODA CO) [YD] 1-9 * example - *; | [A]WO2006061074 (BAYER CROPSCIENCE GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-9* example - * |