EP1848133 - Apparatus and method for transmitting a broadcast signal, method of reproducing a broadcast signal and apparatus for receiving a broadcast signal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2019 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.10.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2018/14] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states LG ELECTRONICS INC. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeoungdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong, Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | ||
Former [2007/43] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20 Yoido-dong Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | ||
For all designated states Munhwa Broadcasting Corp. 31, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, Seong Cheol 106-2102 Sinil Utovill Apt. 55-4 Howon 2(i)-dong Uijeongbu-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kwak, Jae Do 201, 660-9 Yeoksam-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Yang, Seung Heon 143-15 Sangsu-dong Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
Youn, Jong Keun 649-1101 Sejong Apt. 1145 Sanbon-dong Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Choi, Byoung Ho 105-704 Seongjeo Maeul 1-danj Daehwa-dong Ilsan-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Kim, Jin Tae 3567-1 Sanbuk-dong Gunsan-si Jeollabuk-do / KR | 07 /
Jung, Mun Ho 511 A-dong Samik Apt. 51 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [2018/14] |
Former [2007/43] | 01 /
Han, Seong Cheol 106-2102 Sinil Utovill Apt. 55-4 Howon 2(i)-dong Uijeongbu-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Kwak, Jae Do 201, 660-9 Yeoksam-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | |||
03 /
Yang, Seung Heon 143-15 Sangsu-dong Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | |||
04 /
Youn, Jong Keun 649-1101 Sejong Apt. 1145 Sanbon-dong Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
Choi, Byoung Ho 105-704 Seongjeo Maeul 1-danj Daehwa-dong Ilsan-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
06 /
Kim, Jin Tae 3567-1 Sanbuk-dong Gunsan-si Jeollabuk-do / KR | |||
07 /
Jung, Mun Ho 511 A-dong Samik Apt. 51 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [2018/14] |
Former [2007/43] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07008133.6 | 20.04.2007 | [2007/43] | Priority number, date | KR20060036347 | 21.04.2006 Original published format: KR 20060036347 | [2007/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1848133 | Date: | 24.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1848133 | Date: | 25.05.2011 | [2011/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1848133 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04H60/25, H04H20/40 | [2017/40] | CPC: |
H04H60/27 (EP,US);
H04N7/025 (KR);
H04H40/18 (EP,US);
H04H60/25 (EP,US);
H04H60/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/44 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2007/43] | H04H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/14] |
Former [2007/43] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Senden eines Rundfunksignals, Verfahren zur Wiedergabe eines Rundfunksignals und Vorrichtung zum Empfangen eines Rundfunksignals | [2007/43] | English: | Apparatus and method for transmitting a broadcast signal, method of reproducing a broadcast signal and apparatus for receiving a broadcast signal | [2007/43] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour la transmission d'un signal de diffusion hertzienne, méthode pour la reproduction d'un signal de diffusion hertzienne et appareil pour la réception d'un signal de diffusion hertzienne | [2007/43] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.10.2011 | Examination requested [2011/48] | 24.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.03.2015 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 08.04.2015 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 29.08.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.09.2017 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.10.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.01.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.04.2007 | AT | 04.04.2018 | CY | 04.04.2018 | CZ | 04.04.2018 | DK | 04.04.2018 | EE | 04.04.2018 | ES | 04.04.2018 | FI | 04.04.2018 | IT | 04.04.2018 | LT | 04.04.2018 | LV | 04.04.2018 | MC | 04.04.2018 | NL | 04.04.2018 | PL | 04.04.2018 | RO | 04.04.2018 | SE | 04.04.2018 | SI | 04.04.2018 | SK | 04.04.2018 | TR | 04.04.2018 | IE | 20.04.2018 | LU | 20.04.2018 | MT | 20.04.2018 | BE | 30.04.2018 | CH | 30.04.2018 | LI | 30.04.2018 | BG | 04.07.2018 | GR | 05.07.2018 | IS | 04.08.2018 | PT | 06.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 20.04.2007 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 20.04.2018 | ||
LU | 20.04.2018 | ||
MT | 20.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 20.04.2007 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 20.04.2018 | ||
LU | 20.04.2018 | ||
MT | 20.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
TR | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 20.04.2018 | ||
LU | 20.04.2018 | ||
MT | 20.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 20.04.2018 | ||
LU | 20.04.2018 | ||
MT | 20.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 20.04.2018 | ||
LU | 20.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
IE | 20.04.2018 | ||
LU | 20.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
IT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 20.04.2018 | ||
BE | 30.04.2018 | ||
CH | 30.04.2018 | ||
LI | 30.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
DK | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 20.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 04.04.2018 | |
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 20.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 04.04.2018 | |
ES | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
LU | 20.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
PL | 04.04.2018 | ||
SE | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
NL | 04.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 04.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US5610653 (ABECASSIS MAX [US]) [X] 1-5,8-16,19-24,27-29,31,32 * column 2, lines 29-42 * * column 6, lines 30-33,60-61 * * column 7, lines 35-40,55-60 * * column 8, lines 35-51 * * column 9, lines 56-65 * * column 10, lines 15-32 * * column 11, lines 50-57,63-65 * * column 16, lines 11-22 * * column 18, lines 38-47,58-65 * * column 20, lines 41-45 * * column 27, lines 28-30 * * column 28, lines 38-44,59-64 * * column 31, lines 7-10,15-22 * * column 32, lines 24-27 * * column 34, line 62 - column 35, line 4 * * column 37, lines 36-38 * * figures 3A-3D * [I] 6,7,17,18,25,26,30; | [XA]US2002067436 (SHIRAHAMA AKIRA [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,13,19,28,29,31 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] , [0 55] - [0057] * [A] 2-7,9-12,14-18,20-24,27,32; | [XA]EP1460849 (SONY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,8,13,19,28,29,31 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0010] - [0014] - [0015] - [0078] , [0086] - [0090] - [0092] - [0094] * [A] 2-7,9-12,14-18,20-24,27,32; | [XA]US2004244037 (YAMAGUCHI TAKAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,13,19,28,29,31 * paragraphs [0058] , [0076] , [0079] - [0081] - [0083] * [A] 2-7,9-12,14-18,20-24,27,32; | [XA]EP1503589 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,8,13,19,28,29,31 * paragraphs [0026] - [0029] * [A] 2-7,9-12,14-18,20-24,27,32; | [XA]WO2005043783 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,13,19,28,29,31 [A] 2-7,9-12,14-18,20-24,27,32; | [A]US2005285997 (KOYAMA YOSHIHIDE [JP], et al) [A] 25,26 * paragraphs [0083] - [0086] *; | EP1657835 [ ] (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [ ] * paragraphs [0059] - [0061] * | Examination | EP1501316 | WO2005069621 | US2005196143 | EP1628490 |