EP1868307 - Transmitting and outputting content triggered by an event at the receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-Dong Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-Dong Yeongdeungpo-Gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong, Yongdungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | ||
Former [2007/51] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20 Yeouido-dong, Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | ||
For all designated states Munhwa Broadcasting Corp. 31, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Han, Seong Cheol 106-2102 Sinil Utovill Apt. 55-4 Howon 2(i)-dong Uijeongbu-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kwak, Jae Do 201, 660-9 Yeoksam-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Yang, Seung Heon 143-15 Sangsu-dong Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | 04 /
Youn, Jong Keun 649-1101 Sejong Apt. 1145 Sanbon-dong Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 05 /
Choi, Byoung Ho 105-704 Seongjeo Maeul 1-danj Daehwa-dong Ilsan-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 06 /
Kim, Jin Tae 3567-1 Sanbuk-dong Gunsan-si Jeollabuk-do / KR | 07 /
Jung, Mun Ho 511 A-dong, Samik Apt. 51 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul / KR | [2014/19] |
Former [2007/51] | 01 /
Han, Seong Cheol 106-2102 Sinil Utovill Apt. 55-4 Howon 2(i)-dong Uijeongbu-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | ||
02 /
Kwak, Jae Do 201, 660-9 Yeoksam-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | |||
03 /
Yang, Seung Heon 143-15 Sangsu-dong Mapo-gu Seoul / KR | |||
04 /
Youn, Jong Keun 649-1101 Sejong Apt. 1145 Sanbon-dong Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
05 /
Choi, Byoung Ho 105-704 Seongjeo Maeul 1-danj Daehwa-dong Ilsan-gu Goyang-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | |||
06 /
Kim, Jin Tae 3567-1 Sanbuk-dong Gunsan-si Jeollabuk-do / KR | |||
07 /
Jung, Mun Ho 511 A-dong, Samik Apt. 51 Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul / KR | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/51] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07008136.9 | 20.04.2007 | [2007/51] | Priority number, date | KR20060040660 | 04.05.2006 Original published format: KR 20060040660 | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1868307 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1868307 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1868307 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04H60/11, H04H60/27, H04N21/433, H04N21/438, H04N21/81 | [2013/51] | CPC: |
H04H60/11 (EP,US);
H04N21/23 (KR);
H04N21/433 (EP,US);
H04N21/4331 (EP,US);
H04N21/4384 (EP,US);
H04N21/812 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/51] | H04H1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Title | German: | Übertragung und Ausgabe von Inhalt aufgrund von einem Ereignis beim Empfänger | [2007/51] | English: | Transmitting and outputting content triggered by an event at the receiver | [2007/51] | French: | Transmission et affichage de contenu causé par un événement au récepteur | [2007/51] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.07.2011 | Examination requested [2011/35] | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.12.2013 | 03.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.12.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.04.2007 | AT | 07.05.2014 | BE | 07.05.2014 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | IT | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | LV | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | MT | 07.05.2014 | NL | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SE | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2016/01] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
IT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
BE | 07.05.2014 | ||
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 07.05.2014 | |
CY | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SE | 07.05.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2004244037 (YAMAGUCHI TAKAO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10-13,16-20,23 * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0067] * * paragraph [0077] - paragraph [0096] * * paragraphs [0102] , [0112] * * paragraph [0120] - paragraph [0123] * [I] 3,4,8,9,14,15,21,22,24-29; | [XI]EP1503589 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,2,5-7,10-13,16-20,23 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0034] * [I] 3,4,8,9,14,15,21,22,24-29; | [XI]WO2005043783 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,10-13,16-20,23 * abstract * [I] 3,4,8,9,14,15,21,22,24-29; | [XPY]EP1657835 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 1,2,5-7,10-13,16-20,23 * paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0075] - paragraph [0076] *[Y] 3,4,8,9,14,15,21,22,24-29 | Examination | US2001048463 | US2003095177 | EP1406456 | EP1406163 | EP1501316 |