EP1808798 - Personal identification device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miura, Naoto c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Office 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Nagasaka, Akio c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Office 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Miyatake, Takafumi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Office 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2007/29] | Application number, filing date | 07008250.8 | 25.06.2004 | [2007/29] | Priority number, date | JP20030300712 | 26.08.2003 Original published format: JP 2003300712 | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1808798 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1808798 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, G06K9/20, G06T5/00 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
G06V40/40 (EP,US);
G06V10/10 (EP,US);
G06V40/145 (EP,US);
G06V40/67 (EP,US);
G06V40/1341 (EP,US);
G06V40/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/29] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Personenerkennung | [2007/29] | English: | Personal identification device | [2007/29] | French: | Appareil de reconnaissance de personnes | [2007/29] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04014993.2 / EP1524621 | EP05018572.7 / EP1617350 | Divisional application(s) | EP10006256.1 / EP2234034 | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0387522 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 3* abstract *; | [YA]EP1187055 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,4 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0031] * [A] 3; | [Y]US2002048014 (KONO MIYUKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4 * abstract * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0045] *; | [Y] - WYSOSKI S G ET AL, "A rotation invariant approach on static-gesture recognition using boundary histograms and neural networks", NEURAL INFORMATION PROCESSING, 2002. ICONIP '02. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 9TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON NOV. 18-22, 2002, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20021118), vol. 4, ISBN 981-04-7524-1, pages 2137 - 2141, XP010638991 [Y] 1,2,4 * abstract * * page 2138, column L, paragraph 5 * | [Y] - YU OHARA ET AL, "Face identification using an onmidirectional image sequence", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 2002 IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS. (IROS 2002). LAUSANNE, SWITZERLAND, SEPT. 30 - OCT. 4, 2002, IEEE/RSJ INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTELLIGENT ROBOTS AND SYSTEMS, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20020930), VOL. 1 OF 3, ISBN 0-7803-7398-7, pages 275 - 280, XP010609264 [Y] 1,2,4 * page 275, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 277, column R, paragraph 2 - paragraph 4 * | [Y] - LU G ET AL, "Palmprint recognition using eigenpalms features", PATTERN RECOGNITION LETTERS, NORTH-HOLLAND PUBL. AMSTERDAM, NL, (200306), vol. 24, no. 9-10, ISSN 0167-8655, pages 1473 - 1477, XP004410685 [Y] 1,2,4 * page 1464, column L, paragraph 3 * |