EP1849638 - Glass run [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.2010 [2010/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1, Aza Nagahata, Oaza Ochiai, Haruhi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-pref., 452-8564 / JP | [2007/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takase, Tomohiro c/o Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1 Aza Nagahata Oaza Ochiai Haruchi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | 02 /
Toki, Satoshi c/o Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1 Aza Nagahata Oaza Ochiai Haruchi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | 03 /
Aritake, Masanori c/o Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1 Aza Nagahata Oaza Ochiai Haruchi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | 04 /
Iwasa, Norimasa c/o Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1 Aza Nagahata Oaza Ochiai Haruchi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | [2007/51] |
Former [2007/44] | 01 /
Takase, Tomohiro c/o Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1 Aza Nagahata Oaza Ochiai Haruchi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | ||
02 /
Toki, Satoshi c/o Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1 Aza Nagahata Oaza Ochiai Haruchi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | |||
03 /
Aritake, Masanori c/o Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1 Aza Nagahata Oaza Ochiai Haruchi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | |||
04 /
Iwasa, Norisama c/o Toyoda Gosei Co., Ltd. 1 Aza Nagahata Oaza Ochiai Haruchi-cho Nishikasugai-gun Aichi-ken 452-8564 / JP | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/44] | Kramer - Barske - Schmidtchen Radeckestrasse 43 81245 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07008437.1 | 25.04.2007 | [2007/44] | Priority number, date | JP20060124663 | 28.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006124663 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1849638 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1849638 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60J10/04 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
B60J10/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/28] |
Former [2007/44] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Fensterführungsschiene | [2007/44] | English: | Glass run | [2007/44] | French: | Guidage d'une vitre | [2007/44] | Examination procedure | 26.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 23.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 19.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DX]JP2000033822 (NISHIKAWA RUBBER CO LTD) [DX] 1-6,13-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] *; | [X]JP2002187432 (KINUGAWA RUBBER IND) [X] 1-6,10,12-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] *; | [X]US6412226 (NOZAKI MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,13-16 * column 3, line 65 - column 4, line 21; figures 1A,1B *; | [A]JP2004314875 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) [A] 1* abstract * | by applicant | JP2000033822 | JP2002187432 | US6412226 |