EP1850003 - Variable displacement compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 09.03.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken, 448-8671 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOYOTA JIDOSHOKKI 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi Aichi-ken 448-8671 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukanuma, Tetsuhiko c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 02 /
Yokomachi, Naoya c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | 03 /
Imai, Takayuki c/o Kabushiki Kaisha Toyota Jidoshokki 2-1, Toyoda-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi-ken / JP | [2007/44] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/44] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07008451.2 | 25.04.2007 | [2007/44] | Priority number, date | JP20060124101 | 27.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006124101 | [2007/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1850003 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/44] | Classification | IPC: | F04B27/10, F04B27/18 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
F04B27/1072 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/44] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verdichter mit variabler Verdrängung | [2007/44] | English: | Variable displacement compressor | [2007/44] | French: | Compresseur de déplacement variable | [2007/44] | Examination procedure | 25.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/44] | 27.02.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |