EP1808998 - Method for controlling remote storage devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.06.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/31] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | ||
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huckins, Jeffrey 1931 West Bartlett Court Chandler AZ 85248 / US | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Samson & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/29] | Samson & Partner Patentanwälte Widenmayerstraße 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07008529.5 | 29.08.2001 | [2007/29] | Priority number, date | US20000652690 | 31.08.2000 Original published format: US 652690 | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1808998 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1808998 | Date: | 30.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04N5/00 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
H04N21/4334 (EP,US);
H04N21/6405 (EP,US);
H04N21/6543 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/29] | Title | German: | Steuerung entfernter Speichervorrichtungen | [2007/29] | English: | Method for controlling remote storage devices | [2007/29] | French: | Contrôle de dispositifs de stockage à distance | [2007/29] | Examination procedure | 03.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/39] | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01968227.7 / EP1314295 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010968227) is 18.01.2006 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 08.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.07.2014 | BE | 30.07.2014 | CY | 30.07.2014 | DK | 30.07.2014 | ES | 30.07.2014 | FI | 30.07.2014 | IT | 30.07.2014 | MC | 30.07.2014 | NL | 30.07.2014 | SE | 30.07.2014 | TR | 30.07.2014 | IE | 29.08.2014 | LU | 29.08.2014 | CH | 31.08.2014 | LI | 31.08.2014 | FR | 30.09.2014 | GR | 31.10.2014 | PT | 02.12.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
BE | 30.07.2014 | ||
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
IE | 29.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
IE | 29.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
FR | 30.09.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
IE | 29.08.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
DK | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
IT | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
MC | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
CH | 31.08.2014 | ||
LI | 31.08.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/19] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
BE | 31.08.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 30.07.2014 | |
CY | 30.07.2014 | ||
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
NL | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 30.07.2014 | |
ES | 30.07.2014 | ||
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
GR | 31.10.2014 | ||
PT | 02.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | ES | 30.07.2014 | |
FI | 30.07.2014 | ||
SE | 30.07.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 30.07.2014 | |
SE | 30.07.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5663757 (MORALES FERNANDO [US]) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * column 5, line 54 - column 6, line 26 *; | [X]US5767893 (CHEN MING-SYAN [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * column 2, line 26 - column 3, line 39 *; | [X]US5798785 (HENDRICKS JOHN S [US], et al) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * column 3, line 5 - line 50 * * column 4, line 60 - column 5, line 46 * * column 6, line 3 - line 30 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 14 * * column 9, line 35 - column 10, line 62 *; | [A]US5956716 (KENNER BRIAN [US], et al) [A] 1-22 * abstract * * column 4, line 35 - column 6, line 60 *; | [A] - KURIOKA T ET AL, "TELEVISION HOME SERVER FOR INTEGRATED SERVICES - TOWARD THE REALIZATION OF ISDB ANYTIME SERVICES", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (199811), vol. 44, no. 4, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 1195 - 1199, XP000871416 [A] 1-22 * abstract * * page 1195, line 1 - line 29 * * page 1197, column 2, line 5, paragraph 3.5 - line 11 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.735817 | [A] - EVAIN J-P, "THE MULTIMEDIA HOME PLATFORM", EBU REVIEW- TECHNICAL, EUROPEAN BROADCASTING UNION. BRUSSELS, BE, (19980321), no. 275, ISSN 0251-0936, pages 4 - 10, XP000767493 [A] 1-22 * abstract * * page 7, column 3, line 16 - page 8, column 1, line 44 * * page 9, column 1, line 7 - line 21 * |