EP1852752 - Verification apparatus and verification method for recording media [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.06.2013 [2013/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyazaki, Kenji c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Miki, Takeo c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
Miura, Junji c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
Nakano, Takahisa c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 05 /
Yamaguchi, Takashi c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | 06 /
Tokuda, Shinya c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2007/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/45] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07008674.9 | 27.04.2007 | [2007/45] | Priority number, date | JP20060126371 | 28.04.2006 Original published format: JP 2006126371 | JP20060265583 | 28.09.2006 Original published format: JP 2006265583 | [2007/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1852752 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1852752 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | [2009/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G03H1/22, G03H1/26, G07D7/12 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
G03H1/22 (EP,US);
G06T1/00 (KR);
G01B11/30 (KR);
G01N21/892 (KR);
G02B5/18 (KR);
G03H1/26 (EP,US);
G07D7/0032 (EP,US);
G03H1/265 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2223 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2247 (EP,US);
G03H2001/2273 (EP,US);
G03H2222/34 (EP,US);
G03H2227/06 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/45] | G03H1/22, G03H1/26 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/08] |
Former [2007/45] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verifizierungsvorrichtung und Verifizierungsverfahren für Aufzeichnungsmedien | [2007/45] | English: | Verification apparatus and verification method for recording media | [2007/45] | French: | Appareil de vérification et procédé de vérification pour support d'enregistrement | [2007/45] | Examination procedure | 27.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/45] | 19.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 02.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/25] | 16.01.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5946101 (KOBAYASHI SEIJI [JP]) [A] 1-20 * column 1, line 41 - column 2, line 5 * * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 60 * * column 6, line 52 - column 7, line 34 * * column 8, line 9 - line 47 * * figures 1,2,8,9; claim 1 *; | [XA]FR2785697 (BASLER AG [DE]) [X] 11,20 * page 1, line 36 - page 2, line 21 * * page 5, line 11 - page 8, line 2 * * figure - * [A] 1-10,12-19; | [A]US2005237616 (HILLMANN JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-20 * paragraphs [0003] , [0013] - [0015] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0039] * * paragraph [0064] - paragraph [0067] ** figures 1,5,6 * | by applicant | JP2728205B | FR2785697 | JP2002221496 | JP2003254910 |