EP1882588 - Method for operating a sheet fed printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states manroland AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach/Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states manroland AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | ||
Former [2008/05] | For all designated states MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Mühlheimer Strasse 341 63075 Offenbach / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ehrhard, Toni Am Ziegelgraben 11 64747 Breuberg / DE | 02 /
Lindner, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Hohebergstrasse 51 63150 Heusenstamm / DE | 03 /
Marneth, Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Reinheimer Strasse 71 64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE | 04 /
Wiese, Holger, Dr.-Ing. Golfstrasse 4 63179 Obertshausen / DE | [2008/05] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2014/13] |
Former [2008/30] | Stahl, Dietmar manroland AG Intellectual Property (IPB) Postfach 10 12 64 63012 Offenbach am Main / DE | ||
Former [2008/05] | Stahl, Dietmar MAN Roland Druckmaschinen AG Intellectual Property Bogen (IPB) Postfach 101264 63012 Offenbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 07008727.5 | 28.04.2007 | [2008/05] | Priority number, date | DE20061022952 | 17.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006022952 | DE20071018539 | 19.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007018539 | [2008/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1882588 | Date: | 30.01.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1882588 | Date: | 21.03.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/004, B41F21/10 | [2012/12] | CPC: |
B41F13/008 (EP);
B41F13/0045 (EP);
B41F21/106 (EP);
B41P2233/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2008/05] | B41F13/008 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betreiben einer Bogendruckmaschine | [2008/05] | English: | Method for operating a sheet fed printing press | [2008/05] | French: | Procédé destiné au fonctionnement d'une presse d'impression sur feuilles | [2008/05] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 03.02.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 03.02.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 01.02.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2012/12] | 03.02.2014 | Resumption of proceedings | [2013/48] | 01.02.2012 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2013/48] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10207239 (HEIDELBERGER DRUCKMASCH AG [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0018] *; | [A]DE4435011 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 24 - line 67 *; | [AD]DE4426992 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 2, line 22 - line 68 *; | [AD]EP0812683 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [AD] 1 * column 6, line 8 - line 39 *; | [AD]DE202004016433U (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [AD] 1 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * | by applicant | EP0812683 | DE4426992 | DE202004016433U |