EP1863077 - Substrate inspecting method and methods of manufacturing an element and a substrate [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/49] | Substrate, substrate inspecting method and methods of manufacturing an element and a substrate | ||
[2013/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Electric Industries, Ltd. 5-33 Kitahama 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0041 / JP | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakamura, Takao Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 02 /
Ueda, Toshio Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | 03 /
Kyono, Takashi Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | [2013/33] |
Former [2007/49] | 01 /
Nakamura, Takao Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | ||
02 /
Ueda, Toshio Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | |||
03 /
Kyono, Takashi Itami Works of Sumitomo Electric Ind., Ltd. 1-1, Koyakita 1-chome Itami-shi Hyogo 664-0016 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/33] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07008890.1 | 02.05.2007 | [2007/49] | Priority number, date | JP20060153555 | 01.06.2006 Original published format: JP 2006153555 | JP20070014172 | 24.01.2007 Original published format: JP 2007014172 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1863077 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1863077 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1863077 | Date: | 14.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/66 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
H01L22/10 (EP,US);
H01L22/00 (KR);
H01L22/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/02] |
Former [2007/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Substratprüfungsverfahren und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Elements und eines Substrats | [2013/15] | English: | Substrate inspecting method and methods of manufacturing an element and a substrate | [2013/15] | French: | Procédé d'inspection de substrats et procédés de fabrication d'un élément et d'un substrat | [2013/15] |
Former [2007/49] | Substrat, Substratprüfungsverfahren und Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Elements und eines Substrats | ||
Former [2007/49] | Substrate, substrate inspecting method and methods of manufacturing an element and a substrate | ||
Former [2007/49] | Substrat, procédé d'inspection de substrats et procédés de fabrication d'un élément et d'un substrat | Examination procedure | 05.11.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/51] | 07.11.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.12.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 15.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 02.05.2014 | [2015/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0295065 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [X] 1-4,9-12 * page 19, line 33 - page 21, line 60; figure 6 *; | [X]JP2000021824 (OKI ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4,9-12 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0025]; figures 1-3,6 *; | [X]US6329667 (OTA HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 9-12* column 5, line 15 - column 8, line 24; figures 2,4 *; | [X]US2005003572 (HAHN BERTHOLD [DE], et al) [X] 9-12 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0055]; figure 1 *; | [X]US2005039673 (ISHIDA MASAHIRO [JP]) [X] 9-12 * paragraph [0101] - paragraph [0120]; figure 9G *; | [X]US6972201 (SUBRAMANIAN RAMKUMAR [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * column 3, line 26 - column 9, line 10; figures 1-4 * | Examination | US6031229 | US2005012512 | by applicant | JP2000021824 | US2005012512 |