EP1808172 - Botanical extract compositions and methods of use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.04.2011 [2011/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Activephyto Technologies Limited PO Box 1075 Elizabeth House 9 Castle Street St Helier Jersey JE4 2QP / GB | [2008/35] |
Former [2007/29] | For all designated states The Medical Research and Education Trust 1901 First Avenue, Suite 210 San Diego, CA 92101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chen, Sophie 21 Glenwood Road Millwood, NY 10546 / US | [2007/29] | Representative(s) | Baldock, Sharon Claire Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | Baldock, Sharon Claire BOULT WADE TENNANT Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2007/29] | Leathley, Anna Elisabeth Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07009055.0 | 06.03.2003 | [2007/29] | Priority number, date | US20020362420P | 06.03.2002 Original published format: US 362420 P | US20020374417P | 22.04.2002 Original published format: US 374417 P | [2007/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1808172 | Date: | 18.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1808172 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | [2010/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/352, A61K31/12, A61K45/06, A61K36/539, A61P35/00, A61P5/30, A61P19/08, A61P19/10, A61P19/02, A61P15/12, A61P9/00, A61P25/28, A61P9/10, A61P3/04, A61P13/00 | [2010/10] | CPC: |
A61K31/352 (EP);
A61K31/12 (EP);
A61K45/06 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P15/12 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P5/30 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/12, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/352, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2007/29] | A61K31/352 | Designated contracting states | [2011/05] |
Former [2007/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen mit botanischen Extrakten und Verwendungsverfahren | [2007/29] | English: | Botanical extract compositions and methods of use | [2007/29] | French: | Compostions à base d'extraits botaniques et procédés d'utilisation | [2007/29] | Examination procedure | 01.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/17] | 30.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/17] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03713959.9 / EP1487434 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS60178815 (RIKAGAKU KENKYUSHO) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [XA]EP0742012 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-2,4,6-7 * page 3, line 57 - page 4, line 5 * * page 5, line 27 - page 6, line 21 * * page 11, line 51 - line 56 * * page 12, line 28 - page 13, line 3 * * example 4 * [A] 3; | [XA]JPH09176011 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD) [X] 1,6-7 * abstract * [A] 3-4; | [XA]WO9848790 (ANTICANCER INC [US]) [X] 1-2,6-7 * page 1, line 5 - line 9 * * page 4, line 17 - page 5, line 27 * * page 9, line 25 - line 26 * * page 12, line 15 - page 13, line 5 * * example 2 * * page 18, line 16 - page 19, line 2 * * claims 1-3,8,9 * [A] 4; | [XA]EP0906761 (ARCHER DANIELS MIDLAND CO [US]) [X] 1-2,6-7 * page 3, line 28 - line 32 * * page 4, line 1 - line 14 * * page 6, line 32 - line 35 * * claims 1-6,8,14 * [A] 3-4; | [X]WO0003706 (LAFON LABOR [FR], et al) [X] 1-2,4,6-7 * page 2, line 23 - page 4, line 9 * * page 4, line 26 - page 7, line 6 * * page 14, line 15 - page 39, line 15 * * claims 1-9 *; | [X]WO0130342 (UNIV SOUTHERN ILLINOIS [US], et al) [X] 1,4,6-7 * page 1, line 15 - line 22 * * page 14, line 17 - page 16, line 22 * * page 27, line 3 - line 7 * * page 29, line 24 - line 30 * * page 30, line 29 - line 31 * * example 12 * * claims 1,2,6,7,11,12 *; | [A]DE10118999 (REINERS FRITZ [DE]) [A] 1 * column 2, paragraph 11 * * column 3, paragraph 17 ** claims 1,4 *; | [XP]WO0234073 (FUERST PETER [DE]) [XP] 1-2,6-7 * page 1, line 1 - line 4 * * page 3, line 27 - page 4, line 11 * * page 4, line 24 - line 27 * * page 5, line 7 - line 16 * * page 6, line 4 - page 8, line 10 * * tables 1,2 * * claims 1-5,7,9,12 *; | [AP]WO02080951 (SYNERGISTIX BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [AP] 1-4,6-7 * page 1, line 5 - line 21 * * claims 1,5,9 *; | [X] - IKEMOTO SHINICHI ET AL, "Antitumor effects of Scutellariae radix and its components baicalein, baicalin, and wogonin on bladder cancer cell lines", UROLOGY, (200006), vol. 55, no. 6, ISSN 0090-4295, pages 951 - 955, XP002257001 [X] 1,3-4,6-7 * abstract * * page 951, column 2, paragraph 1 - page 952, column 1, paragraph 4 * * page 952, column 2, paragraph 5 * * page 953, column 2, paragraph 2 * * table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0090-4295(00)00467-2 | [XA] - LEE WOAN-ROUH ET AL, "Wogonin and fisetin induce apoptosis in human promyeloleukemic cells, accompanied by a decrease of reactive oxygen species, and activation of caspase 3 and Ca2+-dependent endonuclease", BIOCHEMICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (20020115), vol. 63, no. 2, ISSN 0006-2952, pages 225 - 236, XP001162761 [X] 1-2,6-7 * abstract * * page 228, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 235, column 1, paragraph 3 * [A] 3-4 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-2952(01)00876-0 | [XP] - MIAO-JING LAI ET AL., "Relative flavone bioavailability of Scutellariae Radix between traditional decoction and commercial powder preparation in humans", J. FOOD AND DRUG ANALYSIS, (200206), vol. 10, no. 2, pages 75 - 80, XP001170316 [XP] 1,3-4,6 * page 75, column 1, paragraph 1 * * page 77, column 2, paragraph 1 * |