EP1990566 - Venting and aerating valve for pipes and fittings [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.05.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hawle Armaturen GmbH Liegnitzer Str. 6 83395 Freilassing / DE | [2008/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Götzinger, Stefan Ulrichshögler Strasse 8 83404 Ainring / DE | 02 /
Grassl, Helmut Roitwalchen 8 83278 Traunstein / DE | [2008/46] | Representative(s) | SSM Sandmair Patentanwälte Rechtsanwalt Partnerschaft mbB Joseph-Wild-Straße 20 81829 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Schwabe - Sandmair - Marx Patentanwälte Stuntzstrasse 16 81677 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07009225.9 | 08.05.2007 | [2008/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1990566 | Date: | 12.11.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1990566 | Date: | 01.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16K24/04, F16K7/18 | [2008/46] | CPC: |
F16K31/24 (EP,US);
F16K24/042 (EP,US);
Y10S251/901 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3099 (EP,US);
Y10T137/3331 (EP,US);
Y10T137/7365 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/46] | Extension states | HR | 11.12.2008 | RS | 11.12.2008 | Title | German: | Be- und Entlüftungslement für Rohrleitungen bzw. Armaturen | [2008/46] | English: | Venting and aerating valve for pipes and fittings | [2008/46] | French: | Soupape d'aération et de ventilation pour des tuyaux et armatures | [2008/46] | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 29.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 01.07.2009 | MT | 01.07.2009 | IS | 01.11.2009 | [2012/37] |
Former [2011/22] | MT | 01.07.2009 | |
IS | 01.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | IS | 01.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0568005 (KAYSER A GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [DA]DE29905743U (FOERSTER SIEGMAR DIPL ING [DE]) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [DA]DE29918722U (FOERSTER SIEGMAR [DE]) [DA] 1-12 * the whole document * |