EP1820462 - Intramedullary nail comprising elements of shape-memory material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORTHOFIX S.r.l. Via delle Nazioni, 9 37012 Bussolengo (Verona) / IT | [2007/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Coati, Michele Via A. Vivaldi, 2 37029 San Pietro in Cariano (Verona) / IT | 02 /
Marazzi, Giancarlo Via Stra Favia, 1/A 21047 Saronno (Varese) / IT | 03 /
Marini, Graziano Via IV Novembre, 74/A 37060 Castel D'Azzano (Verona) / IT | 04 /
Rossi, Graziano Via L. De Besi, 22 37139 Verona / IT | 05 /
Rossi, Luigi Via Silvestro Lega, 7 37019 Peschiera del Garda (Verona) / IT | 06 /
Venturini, Daniele Via dei Carpini, 36 37064 Povegliano Veronese (Verona) / IT | [2008/10] |
Former [2007/34] | 01 /
Coati, Michele Via A. Vivaldi, 2 37029 San Pietro in Cariano (Verona) / IT | ||
02 /
Marazzi, Giancarlo Via Stra Favia, 1/A 21047 Saronno (Varese) / IT | |||
03 /
Marini, Graziano Via IV Novembre, 74/A 37060 Castel D'Azzano (Verona) / IT | |||
04 /
Rossi, Graziano Via L. De Besi, 22 37139 Verona / IT | |||
05 /
Rossi, Luigi Via Forte Laghetto, 8 37019 Peschiera del Garda (Verona) / IT | |||
06 /
Venturini, Daniele Via dei Carpini, 36 37064 Povegliano Veronese (Verona) / IT | Representative(s) | Ferreccio, Rinaldo Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2011/36] | Ferreccio, Rinaldo Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2007/34] | Ferreccio, Rinaldo c/o Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Locatelli 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07009998.1 | 31.03.2005 | [2007/34] | Priority number, date | EP20040007786 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: EP 04007786 | EP20040007785 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: EP 04007785 | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1820462 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1820462 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/72 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
A61B17/7266 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Title | German: | Marknagel mit Formgedächtniselementen | [2007/34] | English: | Intramedullary nail comprising elements of shape-memory material | [2007/34] | French: | Clou intramédullaire comportant des éléments de matériau à mémoire de forme | [2007/34] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/05] | 29.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05734396.4 / EP1740113 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050734396) is 01.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 11.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 07.09.2011 | CY | 07.09.2011 | CZ | 07.09.2011 | EE | 07.09.2011 | FI | 07.09.2011 | LT | 07.09.2011 | PL | 07.09.2011 | RO | 07.09.2011 | SI | 07.09.2011 | SK | 07.09.2011 | BG | 07.12.2011 | IS | 07.01.2012 | PT | 09.01.2012 | IE | 31.03.2012 | LU | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/29] | BE | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
BG | 07.12.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
IE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | BE | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
IE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BE | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | BE | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
PL | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | BE | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
EE | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
RO | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
SK | 07.09.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
PT | 09.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | BE | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
IS | 07.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | BE | 07.09.2011 | |
CY | 07.09.2011 | ||
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 07.09.2011 | |
FI | 07.09.2011 | ||
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 07.09.2011 | |
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
SI | 07.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 07.09.2011 | |
LT | 07.09.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 07.09.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH1057398 ; | [X]DE3838388 (PFEIFER THOMAS DR MED [DE]) [X] 1,9,10,23-26* column 3, line 29 - line 56; figure 2 *; | [X]FR2727304 (FELMAN DANIEL [FR]) [X] 1,3,5,9,10,23-26 * page 2 - page 3 *; | [Y]US5702215 (LI LEHMANN K [US]) [Y] 1,27-35 * page 6, line 22 - line 65; figure 6 *; | [X]FR2783702 (BERTHOLET MAURICE [FR]) [X] 1,3,23-25 * page 4 - page 6; figures 3,4,8,9 *; | [Y]WO03007830 (EXPANDING ORTHOPEDICS INC [US]) [Y] 1,14,27-35 * page 16, line 10 - line 12; figure 14 *; | [Y]US6575973 (SHEKALIM AVRAHAM [IL]) [Y] 1,14 * figure 3 * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980630), vol. 1998, no. 08, & JP10057398 A 19980303 (MONMA MITSURU) [X] 1-3,5-10,12,13,16 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2727304 | EP0772420 | FR2783702 |