EP1860158 - Particles comprising a substrate and an anion-binding layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.10.2014 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Handrosch, Carsten, Dr. Eberstaedter Strasse 24-26 64367 Muehltal / DE | 02 /
Rudolph, Thomas, Dr. Weiterstaedter Strasse 72 64291 Darmstadt / DE | 03 /
Buchholz, Herwig, Dr. Dielmannstrasse 33 60599 Frankfurt/Main / DE | 04 /
Anzali, Soheila, Dr. Am Alten Berg 13 64342 Seeheim-Jugenheim / DE | [2007/48] | Application number, filing date | 07010046.6 | 21.05.2007 | [2007/48] | Priority number, date | DE20061024289 | 24.05.2006 Original published format: DE102006024289 | [2007/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1860158 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1860158 | Date: | 04.05.2011 | [2011/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1860158 | Date: | 04.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C09C1/00 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
C09C1/0015 (EP,US);
C09C3/00 (KR);
A61K8/0266 (EP,US);
A61K8/19 (EP,US);
A61K8/466 (EP,US);
A61K8/602 (EP,US);
A61Q1/04 (EP,US);
A61Q17/04 (EP,US);
B82Y30/00 (EP,US);
C09C1/0021 (EP,US);
C09C1/0063 (EP,US);
C09C3/08 (KR);
A61K2800/412 (EP,US);
A61K2800/436 (EP,US);
A61K2800/56 (EP,US);
A61K2800/63 (EP,US);
C01P2004/32 (EP,US);
C01P2004/54 (EP,US);
C01P2004/62 (EP,US);
C01P2004/64 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1004 (EP,US);
C09C2200/102 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1054 (EP,US);
C09C2200/1087 (EP,US);
C09C2200/301 (EP,US);
C09C2200/302 (EP,US);
C09C2200/303 (EP,US);
C09C2200/409 (EP,US);
C09C2210/10 (EP,US);
Y10T428/29 (EP,US);
Y10T428/294 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2958 (EP,US);
Y10T428/298 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2991 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Title | German: | Partikel umfassend Substrate und eine anionbindende Schicht | [2013/35] | English: | Particles comprising a substrate and an anion-binding layer | [2007/48] | French: | Particule comprenant un substrat et une couche liant des anions | [2007/48] |
Former [2007/48] | Partikel ein Substrat umfassend und eine anionbindende Schicht | Examination procedure | 21.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 04.11.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.10.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 18.10.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.08.2013 | Opposition(s) | 05.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.05.2007 | BG | 04.12.2013 | CY | 04.12.2013 | CZ | 04.12.2013 | DK | 04.12.2013 | EE | 04.12.2013 | ES | 04.12.2013 | FI | 04.12.2013 | IT | 04.12.2013 | LT | 04.12.2013 | LV | 04.12.2013 | MC | 04.12.2013 | MT | 04.12.2013 | NL | 04.12.2013 | PL | 04.12.2013 | RO | 04.12.2013 | SE | 04.12.2013 | SI | 04.12.2013 | SK | 04.12.2013 | TR | 04.12.2013 | GR | 05.03.2014 | IS | 04.04.2014 | PT | 04.04.2014 | AT | 21.05.2014 | GB | 21.05.2014 | IE | 21.05.2014 | LU | 21.05.2014 | BE | 31.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | FR | 02.06.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.05.2007 | |
BG | 04.12.2013 | ||
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
AT | 21.05.2014 | ||
GB | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 21.05.2014 | ||
BE | 31.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
GR | 05.03.2014 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
AT | 21.05.2014 | ||
GB | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 21.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 04.12.2013 | |
CY | 04.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
AT | 21.05.2014 | ||
GB | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 21.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2016/16] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
MT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
AT | 21.05.2014 | ||
GB | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 21.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
AT | 21.05.2014 | ||
GB | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 21.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
GB | 21.05.2014 | ||
IE | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 21.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
IT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 21.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
IE | 21.05.2014 | ||
LU | 21.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SI | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 21.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
MC | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 21.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 21.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/04] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
LU | 21.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
DK | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
CZ | 04.12.2013 | ||
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
ES | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
PL | 04.12.2013 | ||
RO | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
SK | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
PT | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
EE | 04.12.2013 | ||
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
IS | 04.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 04.12.2013 | |
FI | 04.12.2013 | ||
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/25] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
LV | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 04.12.2013 | |
LT | 04.12.2013 | ||
NL | 04.12.2013 | ||
SE | 04.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 04.12.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1481658 (KUBO YASUSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [E]EP1847571 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [E] 1-22* claims 1-18 * |